Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1172802

EP1172802 - Method for adapting to a speaker the phonetic transcriptions of a pronunciation lexicon [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.06.2008
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/03]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Harengel, Steffen
Mitterfeldstrasse 59B
80689 München / DE
02 / Niemöller, Meinrad
Schinderäckerstrasse 21
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
 [2002/03]
Application number, filing date01115523.127.06.2001
[2002/03]
Priority number, dateDE200013424914.07.2000         Original published format: DE 10034249
[2002/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1172802
Date:16.01.2002
Language:DE
[2002/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1172802
Date:13.11.2002
[2002/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1172802
Date:08.08.2007
Language:DE
[2007/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:G10L15/06
[2002/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/31]
Former [2002/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Sprecherabhängige Adaption der phonetischen Transkriptionen eines Aussprache-Lexikons[2007/01]
English:Method for adapting to a speaker the phonetic transcriptions of a pronunciation lexicon[2002/03]
French:Adaptation à un locuteur des transcriptions phonétiques d'un lexique de prononciation[2002/03]
Former [2002/03]Adaptation zum Sprecher der phonetischen Transkriptionen eines Aussprache-Lexikons
Examination procedure07.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/49]
22.01.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2007Fee for grant paid
21.05.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
19.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
21.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH04151200  ;
 [A]EP0342630  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 4, column 6, line 28 - page 5, column 7, line 15; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO9637881  (APPLIED LANGUAGE TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 3 - line 26 * * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 9 * * claims 1,13 *
 [A]  - SLOBADA T ET AL, "Dictionary learning for spontaneous speech recognition", SPOKEN LANGUAGE, 1996. ICSLP 96. PROCEEDINGS., FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA 3-6 OCT. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19961003), ISBN 0-7803-3555-4, pages 2328 - 2331, XP010238131 [A] 1 * abstract * * page 2339, column L, line 19 - page 2330, column L, line 12 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSLP.1996.607274
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920911), vol. 016, no. 436, Database accession no. (P - 1419), [A] 1 * abstract *