Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1172574

EP1172574 - Guiding frame [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.01.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rixen, Wolfgang
Friedenstrasse 107-109
42699 Solingen / DE
For all designated states
Pies, Gerrit
Friedenstrasse 107-109
42699 Solingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/03]For all designated states
Rixen, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Friedenstrasse 107-109
42699 Solingen / DE
For all designated states
Pies, Gerrit
Friedenstrasse 107-109
42699 Solingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/03]
Representative(s)Draudt, Axel Hermann Christian , et al
Dr. Sturies - Eichler - Füssel
Patentanwälte
Lönsstrasse 55
42289 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/31]Draudt, Axel Hermann Christian, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Dr. Sturies - Eichler - Füssel Patentanwälte Lönsstrasse 55
42289 Wuppertal / DE
Former [2002/03]Eichler, Peter, Dipl.-Ing.
Sturies - Eichler - Füssel Patentanwälte, Lönsstrasse 55
42289 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date01115873.029.06.2001
[2002/03]
Priority number, dateDE2000212299U12.07.2000         Original published format: DE 20012299 U
[2002/03]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1172574
Date:16.01.2002
Language:DE
[2002/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1172574
Date:04.09.2002
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16C29/06
[2002/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/03]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Führungsgestell[2002/03]
English:Guiding frame[2002/03]
French:Chassis de guidage[2002/03]
Examination procedure24.12.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/08]
Documents cited:Search[X]US5800065  (LYON GREGORY S [US]) [X] 1,3,7 * column 4, line 7 - column 6, line 27; figures 2-5 *;
 [X]US5217308  (SCHROEDER ROBERT [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 52 - column 6, line 54; figures 1-11 *;
 [A]US3353874  (DEL VECCHIO JOSEPH T, et al) [A] 1,2,4,5 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 37; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]DE9212754U  (SONDERMASCHINENBAU PETER SUHLING GMBH) [A] 1 * page 7, paragraphs 2,3; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]FR2713120  (FELDER JOHANN [AT]) [A] 1,10,11 * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 26; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE4431286  (RIXEN WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 5,11 * column 3, line 67 - column 5, line 31; figures 1,6 *