Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1174616

EP1174616 - Radial piston hydraulic motor/pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.10.2004  [2004/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VAR-SPE S.p.A.
Via Cordellina 131
I-36077 Tavernelle di Altavilla (Vicenza) / IT
[2002/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Speggiorin, Giuseppe
Via Cordellina, 21
36077 Altavilla Vicentina (VI) / IT
 [2002/04]
Representative(s)Bettello, Pietro , et al
Studio Tecnico
Ingg. Luigi e Pietro Bettello
Via Col d'Echele, 25
36100 Vicenza / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/04]Bettello, Pietro, Dott. Ing. , et al
Studio Tecnico Ingg. Luigi e Pietro Bettello Via Col d'Echele, 25
36100 Vicenza / IT
Application number, filing date01117342.418.07.2001
[2002/04]
Priority number, dateIT2000VI0015821.07.2000         Original published format: IT VI000158
[2002/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1174616
Date:23.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1174616
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:F04B1/04, F04B1/107
[2002/04]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/09]
Former [2002/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Radialkolbenpumpe[2002/04]
English:Radial piston hydraulic motor/pump[2002/04]
French:Pompe à piston radial[2002/04]
Examination procedure05.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/41]
13.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.01.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
19.01.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.01.2004M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4148249  (JACOBS STEPHAN J, et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 3, lines 34-48 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 24 * * claim 1 *;
 [X]WO9400691  (MICROHYDRAULICS INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 7 *;
 [X]US3398698  (KARL EICKMANN) [X] 1-4 * page 2, lines 39-53; figure 13 * * column 13, lines 5-40 *;
 [A]GB661652  (OILGEAR CO) [A] 1-4 * column 2, lines 55-59 * * column 6, lines 103-116 * * figures 1,6,7 *;
 [A]US3155047  (ADOLF KEEL) [A] 1-4 * column 1, lines 42-46; figure - * * column 2, lines 20-64 *