Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1182410

EP1182410 - Refrigerator and method of controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
???moredetails.lapse.edited??? FR
published on 28.05.2008  [2008/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/23]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2002/09]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sakuma, Tsutomu, Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation, 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Temmyo, Minoru, Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation, 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
 [2002/09]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/09]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date01117679.926.07.2001
[2002/09]
Priority number, dateJP2000025413124.08.2000         Original published format: JP 2000254131
JP2000025413324.08.2000         Original published format: JP 2000254133
[2002/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1182410
Date:27.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1182410
Date:25.09.2002
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1182410
Date:14.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:F25D11/02, F25D17/06, F25D29/00
[2002/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/24]
Former [2002/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kühlschrank und dessen Steuerungsverfahren[2002/09]
English:Refrigerator and method of controlling the same[2002/09]
French:Réfrigérateur et procédé de commande de celui-ci[2002/09]
Examination procedure26.07.2001Examination requested  [2002/09]
23.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2006Fee for grant paid
06.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR09.03.2007
[2008/22]
Former [2007/45]deleted
Former [2007/36]IT14.06.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2000230766  ;
 [A]JP2000230768  ;
 [A]EP0593194  (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [A] 1,7,13,14,22,23 * column 2, line 3 - column 4, line 2 * * column 5, line 18 - column 5, line 29 * * column 6, line 29 - column 6, line 38 * * column 7, line 44 - column 9, line 55 * * column 14, line 34 - column 16, line 18 * * claims 1,2,4-10,12,14-19 * * figures 1,2,7,12,12A-G *;
 [A]US2576663  (ATCHISON LEONARD W) [A] 1,4,5,7,10,11 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 24 * * column 4, line 5 - column 4, line 75 * * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 37 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2007714  (ZANUSSI A SPA INDUSTRIE) [A] 1,7,13,22 * page 1, line 3 - page 1, line 12 * * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 34 * * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 15 * * claims 1-6 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]FR1050672  (HONORE LOUIS) [A] 1,7,13,22 * page 1, column L, line 18 - page 1, column L, line 28 * * page 2, column L, line 30 - page 2, column L, line 38 * * page 2, column R, line 25 - page 2, column R, line 34 * * page 3, column L, line 38 - page 3, column L, line 44 * * page 3, column R, line 43 - page 4, column L, line 49 * * figures 2,5 *;
 [A]US5765391  (LEE MYUNG RYUL [KR], et al) [A] 1,7,13,14,22,23 * column 4, line 37 - column 4, line 65 * * figure 3 *;
 [A]FR2494412  (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 14,23 * page 1, line 14 - page 1, line 22 * * page 2, line 8 - page 2, line 35 * * page 3, line 10 - page 6, line 14 * * claims 1,3,4 * * figure 1 *;
 [DA]JPH11173729
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, [A] 1-30 * abstract * * figures 1,3-5,7,9,12,11,13 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, [A] 1-14,17-23,26-30 * abstract * * figures 1-3,7-9,11,13 *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, [DA] * abstract * * figures 1-4 *
by applicantJPH11173729