EP1186928 - Optical distance measurement device with parallel processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beier, Bernard, Dr. Lustgartenstrasse 21 68526 Ladenburg / DE | 02 /
Vosseler, Bernd Handschuhsheimer Landstrasse 36 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Fey, Hans-Jürgen, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Fey, Hans-Jürgen, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2002/11] | Duschl, Edgar Johannes, Dr., et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG, Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01117770.6 | 01.08.2001 | [2002/11] | Priority number, date | DE2000144082 | 07.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10044082 | DE2001111245 | 09.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10111245 | [2002/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1186928 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1186928 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1186928 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/28, G01B11/25 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
G02B7/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/11] | G02B7/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/11] | Title | German: | Parallelverarbeitender optischer Entfernungsmesser | [2002/11] | English: | Optical distance measurement device with parallel processing | [2002/11] | French: | Appareil optique de mesure de distances à traitement parallèle | [2002/11] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 07.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.01.2006 | FI | 18.01.2006 | IE | 18.01.2006 | NL | 18.01.2006 | TR | 18.01.2006 | DK | 18.04.2006 | SE | 18.04.2006 | GR | 19.04.2006 | ES | 29.04.2006 | PT | 19.06.2006 | AT | 01.08.2006 | LU | 01.08.2006 | BE | 31.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
TR | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
AT | 01.08.2006 | ||
LU | 01.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
AT | 01.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
AT | 01.08.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
BE | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 29.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4705401 (ADDLEMAN DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-9,21 * figures 1,2 ** column A *; | [X]DE4013283 (HANS LANGER) [X] 1,3-11,13,21 * figure - * * abstract *; | [X]US5675407 (GENG ZHENG JASON [US]) [X] 1-9,16,21 * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [X]US6046812 (BAIK SUNG-HOON [KR], et al) [X] 1-9,12,16,21 * figure - * * column 3, line 22 - column 6, line 8 *; | [X] - T. PFEIFER, P. SOWA, "Untersuchung eines hochgenauen laseroptischen 3D-Konturmessverfahren für die Vermessung von Freiformflächen", 3D-OBJEKTVERMESSUNG AUF KLEINERE ENTFERNUNGEN, VDI Technologiezentrum Physikalische Technologien, Düsseldorf, (199505), pages 1 - 14, XP002271999 [X] 1,14,15,21,22 * figures 1-3 * * page 1 - page 9 * |