blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1162828

EP1162828 - Method and apparatus for implementing seamless playback of continuous media feeds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.2008
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
nCube Corporation
1825 NW 167th Place
Beaverton, OR 97006 / US
For all designated states
Thirdspace Living Limited
Voyager Place, Shoppenhangers Road
Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 2PJ / GB
[2007/18]
Former [2007/12]For all designated states
nCube Corporation
1825 NW 167th Place
Beaverton, OR 97006 / US
For all designated states
Thirdspace Living Limited
Voyager Place, Shoppenhangers Road
Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 2PJ / GB
Former [2003/30]For all designated states
NCube Corporation
1825 NW, 167th Place
Beaverton, OR 97006 / US
For all designated states
Thirdspace Living Limited
Voyager Place, Shoppenhangers Road
Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 2PJ / GB
Former [2003/14]For all designated states
nCube Corporation
110 Marsh Drive, Suite 200
Foster City, California 94404 / US
For all designated states
Thirdspace Living Limited
Voyager Place, Shoppenhangers Road
Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 2PJ / GB
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
ORACLE CORPORATION
500 Oracle Parkway, MS 5op7
Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Weaver, Daniel
536 Vera Avenue
Redwood City, CA 94061 / US
02 / Pawson, David, J.
625 Nevada Avenue
San Mateo, CA 94402 / US
 [2002/22]
Former [2001/50]01 / Weaver, Daniel
536 Vera Avenue
Redwood City, CA 94061 / US
02 / Pawson, David, J.
1501 Locust Street
San Mateo, CA 94402 / US
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstraße 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date01117966.019.10.1998
[2001/50]
Priority number, dateUS1997095626222.10.1997         Original published format: US 956262
[2001/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1162828
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1162828
Date:28.04.2004
[2004/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1162828
Date:02.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.2004
ClassificationIPC:G11B27/00, H04N7/173, H04N5/00, H04N7/24
[2004/18]
CPC:
H04N21/25808 (EP,US); G11B27/031 (EP,US); G11B27/105 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,US); H04N21/23106 (EP,US); H04N21/23113 (EP,US);
H04N21/2318 (EP,US); H04N21/232 (EP,US); H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/236 (EP,US); H04N21/23805 (EP,US); H04N21/2387 (EP,US);
H04N21/2393 (EP,US); H04N21/2402 (EP,US); H04N21/2625 (EP,US);
H04N21/4305 (EP,US); H04N21/434 (EP,US); H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/44004 (EP,US); H04N21/47202 (EP,US); H04N21/6377 (EP,US);
H04N21/658 (EP,US); H04N21/6587 (EP,US); H04N21/8455 (EP,US);
H04N21/8547 (EP,US); H04N21/8549 (EP,US); H04N7/17336 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US); G11B2220/415 (EP,US); Y10S707/99945 (US);
Y10S707/99948 (US) (-)
Former IPC [2001/50]H04N5/00, H04N7/173
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/50]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur nahtlosen Wiedergabe von Videoprogrammen[2001/50]
English:Method and apparatus for implementing seamless playback of continuous media feeds[2001/50]
French:Procédé et appareil de reproduction ininterrompue de programmes de vidéo continus[2001/50]
Examination procedure16.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/38]
08.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2007Fee for grant paid
22.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP98952358.4  / EP1025699
Opposition(s)05.02.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
29.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
12.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0748122  (IBM [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 19 * * page 21, line 30 - page 21, line 46 * * page 29, line 42 - page 30, line 4 * * figures 3,11,24 ** claims 1-4 *;
 [PA]EP0812112  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [PA] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3, line 54 - page 4, line 32 * * figures 4,5 *;
 [PXA]WO9800973  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US], et al) [PX] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 31 - page 5, line 24 * * page 6, line 4 - page 6, line 30 * * page 8, line 1 - page 12, line 11 * * figures 1,3-7 * [PA] 2
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.