blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1175968

EP1175968 - Tool for removing a dowel from a drill hole [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2004  [2004/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schurr, Uwe
Höfelweg 3
76547 Sinzheim / DE
[2002/05]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/05]
Representative(s)Wolf, Eckhard, et al
Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB
Tübinger Strasse 26
70178 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/05]Wolf, Eckhard, Dr.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93
70193 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date01118014.825.07.2001
[2002/05]
Priority number, dateDE200013707927.07.2000         Original published format: DE 10037079
[2002/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1175968
Date:30.01.2002
Language:DE
[2002/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1175968
Date:04.09.2002
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2002
ClassificationIPC:B25B31/00
[2002/05]
CPC:
B25B31/00 (EP)
Designated contracting states[2003/21]
Former [2002/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Werkzeug zum Entfernen eines Dübels aus einem Bohrloch[2002/05]
English:Tool for removing a dowel from a drill hole[2002/05]
French:Outil pour dégager une cheville d'un trou de forage[2002/05]
Examination procedure05.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/01]
18.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
24.04.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2200071  (RUSSELL GARY EDWARD, et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *;
 [X]DE9406268U  (WEISMANN JUN HANS [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE19520308  (SPIRA JAKOB [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *;
 [A]WO9916587  (I R S INSASSEN RETTUNGSSYSTEM [DE], et al) [A] 4,11* figures 2,5 *;
 [X]GB2330107  (CACKETT DENNIS WILLIAM [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * column A; figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.