blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1166806

EP1166806 - Blood reservoir volume sensing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.01.2004
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.03.2004  [2004/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HAEMONETICS CORPORATION
400 Wood Road Braintree
Massachusetts 02184 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]For all designated states
HAEMONETICS CORPORATION
400 Wood Road
Braintree Massachusetts 02184 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Herrig, Russell L.
56 Essex Road
Sharon, Massachusetts, 02067 / US
02 / Plante, Joseph R.
21-11 stoney Brook Drive
Millis, Massachusetts, 02054 / US
03 / Anderson, Frank J.
11 York Road
Mansfield, Massachusetts, 02048 / US
04 / Volpini, Paul M.
35 Rhude Street
Quincy, Massachusetts, 02169 / US
05 / Comeau, Norbert J.
7 Fletcher Drive
Marshfield, Massachusetts, 02050 / US
 [2002/01]
Representative(s)Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date01118015.515.02.1994
[2002/01]
Priority number, dateUS1993003643024.03.1993         Original published format: US 36430
[2002/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1166806
Date:02.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1166806
Date:08.10.2003
[2003/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2003
ClassificationIPC:A61M1/36, G01F23/20, G01F23/22
[2003/41]
CPC:
A61M1/3627 (EP,US); A61M1/3624 (EP,US); A61M1/3692 (EP,US);
G01F23/20 (EP,US); G01F23/2962 (EP,US); A61M1/02 (EP,US);
A61M1/362265 (EP,US); A61M1/3693 (EP,US); A61M1/63 (EP,US);
A61M2205/12 (EP,US); A61M2205/3389 (EP,US); A61M2205/3393 (EP,US);
A61M2209/084 (EP,US); Y10S128/13 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2002/01]A61M1/00, A61M1/36
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/01]
TitleGerman:System zur Messung des Volumens in einem Blutreservoir[2002/01]
English:Blood reservoir volume sensing system[2002/01]
French:Système de mesure du volume d'un réservoir de sang[2002/01]
Examination procedure13.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/33]
02.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/11]
08.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/11]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94909658.0  / EP0690730
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
04.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200209   M06   Fee paid on   04.06.2002
28.02.200310   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB873801  (BAILEY METERS CONTROLS LTD) [Y] 1,2,4-15 * page 4, line 57 - line 64; figure 4 *;
 [A]WO8901792  (HAEMONETICS CORP [US]) [A] 3* figure 6; claims 1,2 *;
 [Y]WO9301858  (SHETTIGAR U RAMAKRISHNA [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-15 * page 14, line 30 - page 15, line 18 * * page 25, line 11 - page 27, line 28; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.