Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1182432

EP1182432 - Flow sensor with housing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.01.2015
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 16.09.2015  [2015/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sensirion Holding AG
Laubisrütistrasse 50
8712 Stäfa / CH
[2008/35]
Former [2006/40]For all designated states
Sensirion AG
Laubisrütistrasse 50 Postfach 235
8712 Stäfa / CH
Former [2002/09]For all designated states
Sensirion AG
Eggbühlstrasse 14
8052 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Mayer, Felix
Viktoriastrasse 38
8052 Zürich / CH
02 / Hornung, Mark R.
Michelstrasse 2
8049 Zürich / CH
 [2002/09]
Representative(s)Sutter, Kurt , et al
E. Blum & Co. AG
Vorderberg 11
8044 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/12]Sutter, Kurt , et al
E. Blum & Co. AG
Vorderberg 11
8044 Zürich / CH
Former [2010/10]Sutter, Kurt , et al
E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11
8044 Zürich / CH
Former [2002/09]Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst , et al
c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11
8044 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date01118861.216.08.2001
[2002/09]
Priority number, dateCH2000000164423.08.2000         Original published format: CH 16442000
[2002/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1182432
Date:27.02.2002
Language:DE
[2002/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1182432
Date:28.08.2002
[2002/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1182432
Date:19.03.2014
Language:DE
[2014/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01F1/684
[2002/09]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2003/21]
Former [2002/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Flusssensor mit Gehäuse[2002/09]
English:Flow sensor with housing[2002/09]
French:Capteur de débit avec boîtier[2002/09]
Examination procedure04.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/01]
01.03.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.06.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
21.11.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2008Observations by third parties
24.09.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.10.2013
08.10.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2013Fee for grant paid
23.12.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.06.2006
Opposition(s)22.12.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
09.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
15.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
05.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
26.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
07.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
22.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR01.09.2014
[2015/38]
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19614459  (GRUNDFOS AS) [A] 1 * column 2, line 27 - column 2, line 43 * * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 15; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE4219454  (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [A] 1,2,7-9,13,14 * figures 2,4 * * column 3, line 18 - column 3, line 20 * * column 4, line 37 - column 4, line 49 *;
 [A]EP0172669  (HONEYWELL INC) [A] 1,3,7,14 * figures 1,2,2A,3,5 * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 7 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 19 *
otherUS4548078
 DE68909195T
 WO0011481
 EP0513263