Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1182762

EP1182762 - Electrical tool and method of its use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2010
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schneider Electric Motion Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG
Breslauer Strasse 7
77933 Lahr / DE
[2008/30]
Former [2002/09]For all designated states
Berger Lahr GmbH & Co. KG
Breslauer Strasse 7
77933 Lahr / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Moddemann, Jörg
An der Halde 13
77749 Hohberg / DE
 [2002/09]
Representative(s)Maucher, Wolfgang , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät
Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen
Urachstrasse 23
79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Maucher, Wolfgang , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23
79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE
Former [2002/09]Maucher, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät, PA Dipl.-Ing. W. Maucher, PA und RA H. Börjes-Pestalozza, Dreikönigstrasse 13
79102 Freiburg / DE
Application number, filing date01118960.204.08.2001
[2002/09]
Priority number, dateDE200014160724.08.2000         Original published format: DE 10041607
[2002/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1182762
Date:27.02.2002
Language:DE
[2002/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1182762
Date:18.06.2003
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1182762
Date:13.01.2010
Language:DE
[2010/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:H02H7/08, G05B9/03
[2002/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/09]
TitleGerman:Elektrisches Arbeitsgerät sowie Verfahren zu dessen Betreiben[2002/09]
English:Electrical tool and method of its use[2002/09]
French:Outil électrique et procédé pour son utilisation[2002/09]
Examination procedure21.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/35]
15.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.2009Fee for grant paid
12.10.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.10.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
17.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
19.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
19.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IE13.01.2010
IT13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
TR13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
AT04.08.2010
GB04.08.2010
LU04.08.2010
BE31.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
FR31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]CY13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IE13.01.2010
IT13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
AT04.08.2010
GB04.08.2010
LU04.08.2010
BE31.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
FR31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2012/01]CY13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IE13.01.2010
IT13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
AT04.08.2010
GB04.08.2010
BE31.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
FR31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2011/43]CY13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IE13.01.2010
IT13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
GB04.08.2010
BE31.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
FR31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2011/35]CY13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IE13.01.2010
IT13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
BE31.08.2010
CH31.08.2010
FR31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2011/20]CY13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IE13.01.2010
IT13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
CH31.08.2010
LI31.08.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2011/15]CY13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IE13.01.2010
IT13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
MC31.08.2010
Former [2011/14]CY13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IE13.01.2010
IT13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
Former [2011/07]CY13.01.2010
DK13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IE13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
Former [2010/49]CY13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IE13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
SE13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
Former [2010/47]CY13.01.2010
FI13.01.2010
IE13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
Former [2010/46]FI13.01.2010
IE13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
GR14.04.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
Former [2010/38]FI13.01.2010
NL13.01.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
Former [2010/35]NL13.01.2010
ES24.04.2010
PT13.05.2010
Former [2010/32]ES24.04.2010
Documents cited:Search[A]US5446354  (HIRUMA ATSUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1,6 * column A *
by applicantDE3029851
 DE4441070