Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1150022

EP1150022 - System and assembly method and device having such a system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.03.2003  [2003/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Elyce Innovation
2 rue Robert Le Ricolais
F-44300 Nantes / FR
[2001/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Chene, Emmanuel
13, boulevard Trittau
F-44450 Saint Julien de Concelles / FR
 [2001/44]
Representative(s)Pontet, Bernard
Pontet Allano & Associés
Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon
CS 70003 Saint Aubin
91192 Gif sur Yvette Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/44]Pontet, Bernard
Pontet Allano & Associés s.e.l.a.r.l. 25 rue Jean-Rostand Parc Club Orsay Université
91893 Orsay Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date01119491.712.11.1997
[2001/44]
Priority number, dateFR1996001376812.11.1996         Original published format: FR 9613768
FR1997000619721.05.1997         Original published format: FR 9706197
[2001/44]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1150022
Date:31.10.2001
Language:FR
[2001/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1150022
Date:05.12.2001
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:F16B7/14, B65D41/04
[2001/44]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/44]
Extension statesRO14.08.2001
TitleGerman:System und Herstellungsverfahren, sowie eine Vorrichtung mit einem derartigen System[2001/44]
English:System and assembly method and device having such a system[2001/44]
French:Système et procédé d'assemblage, et dispositifs pourvus de ce système[2001/44]
Examination proceduredeletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
14.08.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
06.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/12]
17.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/12]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97945910.4  / EP0937207
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.07.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4193509  (DUNN C E LEE JR [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,17 * column 3, line 32 - line 48 * * column 4, line 4 - line 18 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US5145080  (IMBERY JR LEO R [US]) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - line 54 * * figures 1,3,5,6,10,11 *;
 [A]US5411157  (KING ROGER MILNER [GB], et al) [A] 18,20 * column 8, line 10 - line 18 * * figure 14 *
by applicantWO9407038
 WO9414160