Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1162343

EP1162343 - Rock drilling tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hawera Probst GmbH
Schützenstrasse 77
88212 Ravensburg / DE
[2001/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Fuss, Mathias
Luzernestrasse 13
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
02 / Wagegg, Thomas
Im Stock 25
3924 St. Niklaus
Wallis / CH
03 / Moser, Bernhard
Ulrichstrasse 31
88361 Altshausen / DE
 [2002/01]
Former [2001/50]01 / Fuss, Mathias
Luzernestrasse 13
70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
02 / Wagegg, Thomas
Rehweg 1
88353 Kisslegg / DE
03 / Moser, Bernhard
Ulrichstrasse 31
88361 Altshausen / DE
Representative(s)Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte
Großtobeler Straße 39
88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler
Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8
88212 Ravensburg / DE
Former [2001/50]Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten & Roth
Karlstrasse 8
88212 Ravensburg / DE
Application number, filing date01119583.125.11.1998
[2001/50]
Priority number, dateDE199715373104.12.1997         Original published format: DE 19753731
[2001/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1162343
Date:12.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1162343
Date:06.03.2002
[2002/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1162343
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:E21B10/44
[2001/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT [2001/50]
TitleGerman:Gesteinsbohrwerkzeug[2001/50]
English:Rock drilling tool[2001/50]
French:Outil de forage pour roche[2001/50]
Examination procedure07.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/32]
06.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2003Fee for grant paid
26.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP98963379.7  / EP1047857
Divisional application(s)EP03005199.9  / EP1316669
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.12.200104   M06   Fee paid on   13.02.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT04.06.2003
NL04.06.2003
PT04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
BE30.11.2003
[2007/36]
Former [2005/01]NL04.06.2003
PT04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
BE30.11.2003
Former [2004/03]NL04.06.2003
PT04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/02]NL04.06.2003
PT04.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US4967855  (MOSER BERNHARD [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 37-40 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US5487434  (OBERMEIER JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *