Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1249744

EP1249744 - Method and apparatus for providing consistent memory contents in a redundant system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.10.2006  [2006/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/42]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Peleska, Pavel
Magmannstrasse 4
82166 Gräfelfing / DE
 [2002/42]
Application number, filing date01120254.623.08.2001
[2002/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1249744
Date:16.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/042, G05B19/05
[2002/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2003/28]
Former [2002/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen konsistenter Speicherinhalte in redundanten Systemen[2002/42]
English:Method and apparatus for providing consistent memory contents in a redundant system[2002/42]
French:Procédé et appareil pour obtenir des contenus de mémoire identiques dans un système redondant[2002/42]
Examination procedure18.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/42]
17.04.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.08.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, TR
16.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/43]
07.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.05.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
28.05.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
28.05.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
28.05.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
28.05.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
28.05.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
28.05.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
28.05.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
28.05.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
28.05.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
28.05.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
28.05.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
28.05.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US6260159  (ROWLINSON STEPHEN ET AL) [A] 1,2,7,8,11 * abstract * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 62 * * column 4, line 18 - line 48 * * column 8, line 43 - line 51 * * column 10, line 58 - column 11, line 13 *;
 [A]EP0460308  (HONEYWELL INC) [A] 1,3,5,10,12 * abstract * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 29 * * column 4, line 15 - line 42 * * column 6, line 8 - line 23 *;
 [A]US5202980  (SUGIYAMA YOSHIAKI ET AL) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * column 3, line 8 - line 33 * * column 6, line 18 - line 28 * * column 17, line 50 - column 18, line 21 *;
 [A]DE4005321  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1,8-10 * the whole document *