Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1185044

EP1185044 - Control station, apparatus and network system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2008
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OMRON CORPORATION
801, Minamifudodo, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
[2007/50]
Former [2002/10]For all designated states
Omron Corporation
801, Minamifudodo, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sasamori, Toshiaki, c/o Omron Corporation
801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru
Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
02 / Koshiro, Chiaki, c/o Omron Corporation
801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru
Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
03 / Ikeno, Naoaki, c/o Omron Corporation
801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru
Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
04 / Shimomura, Takuya, c/o Omron Corporation
801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru
Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
05 / Hirata, Masuhisa, c/o Omron Corporation
801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru
Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
 [2002/10]
Representative(s)Kilian, Helmut
Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner
Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/10]Kilian, Helmut, Dr.
Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date01120599.429.08.2001
[2002/10]
Priority number, dateJP2000026523401.09.2000         Original published format: JP 2000265234
[2002/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1185044
Date:06.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1185044
Date:25.06.2003
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1185044
Date:12.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/64
[2002/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/12]
Former [2002/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Steuerungsstation, Vorrichtung und Netzwerksystem[2007/47]
English:Control station, apparatus and network system[2002/10]
French:Station de contrôle, dispositif et système réseau[2002/10]
Former [2002/10]Steuerungsstation, Vorrichtung und Nezwerksystem
Examination procedure25.09.2001Examination requested  [2002/10]
30.12.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.04.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
14.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.2007Fee for grant paid
08.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.09.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
30.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.02.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
09.02.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YX]US6111888  (GREEN THOMAS C [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * column 4, line 6 - line 21 * * column 8, line 35 - line 39 * * column 10, line 23 - line 36 * * column 11, line 3 - line 9 * * column 13, line 39 - line 41 * * figures 1,6 * [X] 8;
 [YA]  - HONG S H ET AL, "Bandwidth allocation scheme in CAN protocol", IEE PROCEEDINGS D. CONTROL THEORY & APPLICATIONS, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS. STEVENAGE, GB, (20000125), vol. 147, no. 1, ISSN 1350-2379, pages 37 - 44, XP006014013 [Y] 1,3,4 * page 37, column R, line 40 - page 38, column L, line 15 * * page 38, column L, line 43 - column R, line 8 * * page 41, column 1, line 23 - line 28; figure 1 * [A] 8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-cta:20000126
 [A]  - CAVALIERI S ET AL, "Jitter-based policies to improve asynchronous bandwidth exploitation in fieldbus communication systems", INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, CONTROL, AND INSTRUMENTATION, 1996., PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1996 IEEE IECON 22ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TAIPEI, TAIWAN 5-10 AUG. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19960805), ISBN 0-7803-2775-6, pages 916 - 921, XP010203497 [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IECON.1996.566000
 [A]  - CAVALIERI S ET AL, "CAN assessment in time-critical cyclic applications through Petri net model", INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, CONTROL, AND INSTRUMENTATION, 1996., PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1996 IEEE IECON 22ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TAIPEI, TAIWAN 5-10 AUG. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19960805), ISBN 0-7803-2775-6, pages 922 - 927, XP010203498 [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IECON.1996.566001
 [Y]  - DECOTIGNIE J D ET AL, "PRODUCER-DISTRIBUTOR-CONSUMER MODEL ON CONTROLLER AREA NETWORK", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IFAC/IFIC WORKSHOP, REAL TIME PROGRAMMING, OXFORD, GB, (19951106), pages 35 - 42, XP002074139 [Y] 2,5-7 * page 41, column L, line 27 - line 36 * * Figures 6, 7 *
 [A]  - CAVALIERI S ET AL, "Exploiting FDDI communication features to connect FieldBuses in process control environment", LOCAL COMPUTER NETWORKS, 1994. PROCEEDINGS., 19TH CONFERENCE ON MINNEAPOLIS, MN, USA 2-5 OCT. 1994, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, (19941002), ISBN 0-8186-6680-3, pages 59 - 66, XP010128943 [A] 2,5-7 * page 61, column R, line 5 - line 48 * * page 62, column R, line 31 - line 47 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LCN.1994.386615
 [A]  - CAVALIERI S ET AL, "Enhancing performance in FieldBus communication systems", EMERGING TECHNOLOGIES AND FACTORY AUTOMATION, 1996. EFTA '96. PROCEEDINGS., 1996 IEEE CONFERENCE ON KAUAI, HI, USA 18-21 NOV. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19961118), ISBN 0-7803-3685-2, pages 609 - 615, XP010204173 [A] 8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ETFA.1996.573960