blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1190885

EP1190885 - Method and system for limiting vehicle speed and/or estimating the vertical load on a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.09.2007
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.10.2007  [2007/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2002/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Hessmert, Ulrich
Richard-Wagner-Strasse 3
71701 Schwieberdingen / DE
02 / Brachert, Jost
Gottfried-Keller-Str. 39
71254 Ditzingen / DE
03 / Sauter, Thomas
Silcherstrasse 19
71686 Remseck / DE
04 / Wandel, Helmut
Kelterstrasse 33
71706 Markgroeningen / DE
05 / Polzin, Norbert
Burgunderweg 1
74374 Zaberfeld / DE
 [2002/13]
Application number, filing date01121051.501.09.2001
[2002/13]
Priority number, dateDE200014750126.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10047501
DE200113220703.07.2001         Original published format: DE 10132207
[2002/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1190885
Date:27.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1190885
Date:30.08.2006
[2006/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2006
ClassificationIPC:B60K31/04, G01M17/02, G01N19/00, G01L5/00
[2002/13]
CPC:
B60K31/04 (EP); B60W30/146 (EP); B60T2250/02 (EP);
B60W2530/10 (EP); B60W2530/20 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2007/19]
Former [2002/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Geschwindigkeitsbegrenzung und/oder zur Ermittlung der Aufstandskraft eines Fahrzeugs[2002/13]
English:Method and system for limiting vehicle speed and/or estimating the vertical load on a vehicle[2002/13]
French:Procéde et système de limitation de vitesse et/ou estimation de la charge utile d'un véhicule[2002/13]
Examination procedure31.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/41]
24.05.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.04.2007DE   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2007FR   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2007GB   M01   Not yet paid
11.04.2007IT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
11.04.2007M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200606   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]CN1152509  ;
 [X]FR2626220  (MECA LABO [FR]) [X] 1,10 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4911259  (DOGAHARA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,10,11* abstract *;
 [XY]US5070959  (GRABOWSKI FRANCIS M [US]) [X] 1,3,10,11 * abstract * [Y] 2;
 [PX]WO0161172  (TONDER DEON VAN [ZA], et al) [PX] 1,3,10,11 * claims 1,6,14,16 *;
 [XY]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 37, Database accession no. 2001-344185, XP002375626 & CN1152509 A 19970625 (XIA Y) [X] 1,10 * abstract * [Y] 2
by applicantDE4228413
 DE19549224
 DE19620581
 US5992551
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.