Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1164532

EP1164532 - Device for the contactless transmission of data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 05.09.2007  [2007/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2001/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Lorenz, Gaul, Dr.
Schubertstrasse 14
85101 Lenting / DE
02 / Häring, Martin
110 Rosewell Way
95138 San Jose / US
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]Epping Hermann & Fischer
Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date01121395.611.05.1999
[2001/51]
Priority number, dateDE199812190915.05.1998         Original published format: DE 19821909
DE199814506530.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19845065
[2001/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1164532
Date:19.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1164532
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1164532
Date:12.01.2005
Language:DE
[2005/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/00, G06K19/07
[2002/01]
Former International [2001/51]G06K7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/51]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur kontaktlosen Übertragung von Daten[2001/51]
English:Device for the contactless transmission of data[2001/51]
French:Dispositif de transmission de données sans contact[2001/51]
Examination procedure02.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
17.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2004Fee for grant paid
09.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99934466.6  / EP1076876
Opposition(s)13.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT12.01.2005
ES23.04.2005
CH31.05.2005
LI31.05.2005
[2007/36]
Former [2006/14]ES23.04.2005
CH31.05.2005
LI31.05.2005
Former [2006/12]ES23.04.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2208025  (GEN ELECTRIC CO PLC) [A] 3,7 * page 5, line 16 - line 18 * * sentence 11 - sentence 23 * * page 10, line 22 - line 26 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0638872  (NEDAP NV [NL]) [A] 1,3,7,8 * claims 1,7 *;
 [A]WO9811504  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0377257  (NEDAP NV [NL]) [A] 1 * claim 9 *;
 [A]US5287112  (SCHUERMANN JOSEF H [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 7 *
ExaminationUS5241160