Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1263166

EP1263166 - Media converter and failure detection technique [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.07.2011
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.08.2011  [2011/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Allied Telesis Kabushiki Kaisha
TOC bldg. 4F, 22-17, Nishi-gotanda 7-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8635 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]For all designated states
Allied Telesis Kabushiki Kaisha
TOC bldg. 4F, 22-17, Nishi-gotanda 7-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-8635 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kohda, Yoshimi, Allied Telesis K.K., TOC bldg.4F
22-17, Nishi-gotanda 7-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8635 / JP
 [2002/49]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2002/49]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date01121485.507.09.2001
[2002/49]
Priority number, dateJP2001015827728.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001158277
JP2001015827828.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001158278
[2002/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1263166
Date:04.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1263166
Date:18.11.2009
[2009/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/26
[2002/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2010/29]
Former [2002/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Medienumsetzer und Fehlererkennungstechnik[2002/49]
English:Media converter and failure detection technique[2002/49]
French:Convertisseur de supports et technique pour la détection de panne[2002/49]
Examination procedure26.11.2009Examination requested  [2010/01]
25.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
30.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/31]
16.03.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2011/31]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.02.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
28.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
24.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
23.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0738059  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-5,10-18,22-24,29-33,38,39 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line L *