blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1190923

EP1190923 - Reservoir fixation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 21.08.2019  [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt / DE
[2005/37]
Former [2002/13]For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Tandler, Peter
Krontaler Weg 5
61479 Kronberg/Ts. / DE
02 / Loke, Jörg
Grüner Weg 2
65611 Brechen / DE
03 / König, Harald
Gartenstrasse 7
61239 Ober-Mörlen / DE
04 / Krebs, Werner
Am Biengarten 9
65582 Hambach / DE
05 / Bischoff, Andreas
Rathausstrasse 1
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
06 / Zagler, Berthold
Südring 48
64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE
 [2002/13]
Application number, filing date01121518.308.09.2001
[2002/13]
Priority number, dateDE2000104732525.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10047325
[2002/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1190923
Date:27.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1190923
Date:02.01.2004
[2004/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1190923
Date:14.09.2005
Language:DE
[2005/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2003
ClassificationIPC:B60T11/26, B60T11/22, B60T17/06
[2004/01]
CPC:
B60T11/06 (EP)
Former IPC [2002/13]B60T11/26, B60T11/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2004/39]
Former [2002/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Behälterbefestigung[2002/13]
English:Reservoir fixation[2002/13]
French:Fixation d'un réservoir[2002/13]
Examination procedure02.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/36]
29.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.2005Fee for grant paid
13.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Former [2010/20]deleted
Former [2007/36]IT14.09.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1831509U  (THERMOPLAST UND APPBAU G M B H [DE]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 8 - line 29; figure 3 *;
 [A]FR2324928  (VIRAX SA [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [X]US4472943  (GRABILL PAUL J [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0372909  (NIPPON AIR BRAKE CO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4115063  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *;
 [X]DE19921195  (RAPID SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract *;
 [X]DE19847323  (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.