Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1293757

EP1293757 - Method for determination of the position of a mobile device, particularly an emergency call device, emergency call system and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.02.2006
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.04.2006  [2006/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GPP AG
Kolpingring 18a
82039 Oberhaching / DE
[2003/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Speiser, Fridolin
Am Eschbichl 27
81929 München / DE
 [2003/12]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Strasse 4
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/12]TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date01121841.911.09.2001
[2003/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1293757
Date:19.03.2003
Language:DE
[2003/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/26, G08B25/10, G08G1/0968
[2003/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/03]
Former [2003/50](deleted) 
Former [2003/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Ermitteln der Position einer mobilen Vorrichtung, insbesondere einer Notrufvorrichtung, Notrufsystem sowie Notrufvorrichtung[2003/12]
English:Method for determination of the position of a mobile device, particularly an emergency call device, emergency call system and apparatus[2003/12]
French:Procédé pour déterminer la position d'un dispositif mobile, en particulier un dispositif d'appel de détresse, système et appareil d'appel de détresse[2003/12]
Examination procedure06.06.2002Examination requested  [2003/12]
25.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/15]
09.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.10.2003AT   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003BE   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003CH   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003CY   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003DE   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003DK   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003ES   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003FI   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003FR   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003GB   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003GR   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003IE   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003IT   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003LU   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003MC   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003NL   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003PT   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003SE   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
28.10.2003TR   M01   Fee paid on   14.11.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]US6282491  (VAHLE ANDREAS ET AL) [X] 1-4,6-14 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 4; figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 43; claim 2 * * column 4, line 25 - column 4, line 61 * * column 3, line 15 - column 3, line 61 *;
 [E]DE10029137  (BODYGUARD TECHNOLOGIES GMBH) [E] 1-3,8,13 * column 5, line 2 - column 5, line 7 * * column 6, line 49 - column 6, line 63 * * column 6, line 2 - column 6, line 28; figures 1,3 *;
 [X]DE19755075  (WITTWER JOERG GUENTHER) [X] 1,4,8,13 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 4; claims 1-3 * * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 59 *;
 [X]DE19729645  (INTRONIC SICHERHEITSSYSTEME VE) [X] 1,4,8-10,13 * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 57 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 37; claim 1 *;
 [X]DE19544158  (NESKOM GMBH) [X] 1,8,11,13 * column 1, line 33 - column 1, line 61 *