Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1190615

EP1190615 - Centrifugal fertiliser spreader [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2008
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
???moredetails.lapse.edited??? IT
published on 23.03.2011  [2011/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG
Am Amazonenwerk 9-13
49205 Hasbergen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/31]For all designated states
Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG
Am Amazonenwerk 9-13
49205 Hasbergen / DE
Former [2002/13]For all designated states
Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG
Am Amazonenwerk 9-13
49205 Hasbergen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dreyer, Heinz, Dr. Dipl.-Ing.
Am Amazonenwerk 7
49205 Hasbergen / DE
02 / Dreyer, Justust, Dipl.-Ing.
Am Amazonenwerk 7
49205 Hasbergen / DE
03 / Lührmann, Johannes
Bergstrasse 14
49134 Wallenhorst / DE
04 / Kleine-Ausberg, Peter, Dipl.-Ing.
Schlossstrasse 11
49186 Bad Iburg / DE
05 / Walter, Achim
Hasberger Weg 1
49078 Osnabrück / DE
 [2002/13]
Application number, filing date01122259.318.09.2001
[2002/13]
Priority number, dateDE200014700822.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10047008
DE200111695005.04.2001         Original published format: DE 10116950
[2002/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1190615
Date:27.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1190615
Date:27.11.2002
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1190615
Date:01.08.2007
Language:DE
[2007/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:A01C17/00
[2002/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   IT [2003/33]
Former [2002/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Zentrifugaldüngerstreuer[2002/13]
English:Centrifugal fertiliser spreader[2002/13]
French:Epandeur centrifuge pour engrais[2002/13]
Examination procedure21.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/13]
09.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.05.2007Fee for grant paid
25.05.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
15.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT30.09.2007
[2011/12]
Former [2009/38]deleted
Former [2009/23]FR01.10.2007
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0702889  (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,8,16-19 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 41; figures 3,7 * [A] 6 [Y] 9-12;
 [Y]EP0532055  (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [Y] 9-12 * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0551949  (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [A] 4-6 * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 27 * * column 10, line 7 - column 12, line 39; figures 3,5,8,1012,13 *
by applicantEP0347643