Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1193010

EP1193010 - Indexable cutting insert for turning [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 20.12.2006  [2006/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Plansee Tizit Aktiengesellschaft
6600 Reutte /Tirol / AT
[2002/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Maier, Hans
Innerwand 11
6600 Pflach / AT
 [2002/14]
Representative(s)Lohnert, Wolfgang
Lähn 12
6600 Breitenwang / Reutte / AT
[N/P]
Former [2002/14]Lohnert, Wolfgang, Dr.
Plansee Aktiengesellschaft
6600 Reutte / AT
Application number, filing date01122436.720.09.2001
[2002/14]
Priority number, dateAT2000000070425.09.2000         Original published format: AT 7042000
[2002/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1193010
Date:03.04.2002
Language:DE
[2002/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1193010
Date:04.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:B23B27/16, B23C5/20
[2002/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/14]
TitleGerman:Wendeschneidplatte zum Drehen[2002/14]
English:Indexable cutting insert for turning[2002/14]
French:Plaquette de coupe indexable pour tourner[2002/14]
Examination procedure07.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/16]
02.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2002Fee for grant paid
04.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
IE04.12.2002
TR04.12.2002
PT05.03.2003
[2006/51]
Former [2004/01]FI04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
IE04.12.2002
PT05.03.2003
Former [2003/43]FI04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
PT05.03.2003
Former [2003/31]GR04.12.2002
PT05.03.2003
Former [2003/29]PT05.03.2003
Documents cited:Search[DA]FR1260357  (SANDVIKENS JERNVERKS AB) [DA] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2289344  (CEDARLEAF EDWIN S) [A] 1-3 * figure 4; claim 1 *