EP1198147 - System and method of interfacing nodes in a third generation radio access network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saif, Abid Husain 8050 Saguenay Brossard, Quebec J4X 1H7 / CA | 02 /
Suhail, Hasan PMB No. 335, 16625 Redmond Way Suite M Redmond, WA 98052-4444 / US | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01123301.2 | 08.10.2001 | [2002/16] | Priority number, date | US20000687786 | 13.10.2000 Original published format: US 687786 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1198147 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1198147 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/30, H04L12/56 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
H04W24/04 (EP);
H04W88/12 (EP);
H04W92/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Verbinden von Knoten in einem Funkzugangsnetzwerk der dritten Generation | [2002/16] | English: | System and method of interfacing nodes in a third generation radio access network | [2002/16] | French: | Système et procédé de couplage des noeuds dans un réseau d'acces radio de la troisième génération | [2002/16] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 21.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9935800 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-3,6,20,21 * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 10; figures 1,3 *; | [A]WO9809460 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-3,6,20,21 * page 6, line 5 - line 30; figure 2 *; | [X]US5754959 (UENO MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1,20 * column 16, line 42 - line 54; figure 17 *; | [A]GB2334180 (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [A] 1-9,20,21 * figures 4,6 * |