EP1199000 - Protective helmet, particularly for sports fights [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2006 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lotito, Patrizia Via Natale Sandre 37 10078 Venaria / IT | [2002/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Garavelli, Paolo A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L. Consulenza in Proprietà Industriale Via Servais 27 10146 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Garavelli, Paolo A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L., Via Servais 27 10146 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 01123494.5 | 28.09.2001 | [2002/17] | Priority number, date | IT2000TO00966 | 17.10.2000 Original published format: IT TO000966 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1199000 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1199000 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1199000 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A42B3/00, A63B71/10 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
A63B71/10 (EP);
A42B3/00 (EP);
A42B3/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/17] | A42B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/17] | Title | German: | Schutzhelm, insbesondere für Kampfsportarten | [2002/17] | English: | Protective helmet, particularly for sports fights | [2002/17] | French: | Casque de protection, en particulier pour sports de combat | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 26.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.2005 | BE | 18.05.2005 | CH | 18.05.2005 | FI | 18.05.2005 | LI | 18.05.2005 | NL | 18.05.2005 | TR | 18.05.2005 | DK | 18.08.2005 | GR | 18.08.2005 | SE | 18.08.2005 | CY | 28.09.2005 | LU | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | PT | 24.10.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 18.05.2005 | |
BE | 18.05.2005 | ||
CH | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
LI | 18.05.2005 | ||
NL | 18.05.2005 | ||
TR | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 18.05.2005 | |
BE | 18.05.2005 | ||
CH | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
LI | 18.05.2005 | ||
NL | 18.05.2005 | ||
TR | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 18.05.2005 | |
BE | 18.05.2005 | ||
CH | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
LI | 18.05.2005 | ||
NL | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 18.05.2005 | |
BE | 18.05.2005 | ||
CH | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
LI | 18.05.2005 | ||
NL | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 18.05.2005 | |
BE | 18.05.2005 | ||
CH | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
LI | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 18.05.2005 | |
BE | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 18.05.2005 | |
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 18.08.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1537178 (MAYNARD JOHN E); | [A]US4279038 (BRUECKNER GEORG F, et al); | [A]DE3338188 (BRUECKNER GEORG F [DE]) [A] 1,3-5,8-15 * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 20 * * page 7, line 32 - page 9, line 7 * * figure -; claim 4 *; | [A]DE3603234 (HUEBNER GUMMI & KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [A] 1,4,8-15 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 16 * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 46 * * figure . *; | [A]DE3632525 (WENZEL HOLGER DIPL ING [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,5,10-13 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 20 * * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3626195 (G. F. BRÜCKNER); | [A]DE4002998 (SCHRAMM GUENTHER [DE]); | [A]US5790988 (GUADAGNINO JR VICTOR [US], et al) |