Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1197641

EP1197641 - Starting position locking device for camshaft [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.12.2005
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 05.09.2007  [2007/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hydraulik Ring GmbH
Oststrasse 17
09212 Limbach-Oberfrohna / DE
[2002/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Palesch, Edwin
Kirchheimer Strasse 12
73252 Lenningen / DE
02 / Trzmiel, Alfred
Albstrasse 9
72661 Grafenberg / DE
 [2002/16]
Representative(s)Jackisch-Kohl, Anna-Katharina
Patentanwälte
Jackisch-Kohl & Kohl
Stuttgarter Strasse 115
70469 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/16]Jackisch-Kohl, Anna-Katharina
Patentanwälte Jackisch-Kohl & Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115
70469 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date01123536.329.09.2001
[2002/16]
Priority number, dateDE200015022511.10.2000         Original published format: DE 10050225
[2002/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1197641
Date:17.04.2002
Language:DE
[2002/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1197641
Date:29.01.2003
[2003/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1197641
Date:09.02.2005
Language:DE
[2005/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:F01L1/344, F01L1/34, F02D13/02, F01L13/00
[2003/05]
Former International [2002/16]F01L1/344, F01L1/34
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2003/42]
Former [2002/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Betätigungseinrichtung zum Festlegen einer Nockenwelle eines Antriebsmotors eines Fahrzeuges in einer Startposition[2002/16]
English:Starting position locking device for camshaft[2002/16]
French:Dispositif de verrouillage d'un arbre à cames en position de démarrage[2002/16]
Examination procedure30.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/31]
30.07.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.11.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, TR
26.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2004Fee for grant paid
04.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.09.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT09.02.2005
[2007/36]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1008729  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,10 * abstract *;
 [X]US6024061  (ADACHI MICHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * abstract *;
 [X]US6035819  (NAKAYOSHI HIDEKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0821138  (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [X] 1-4,10 * abstract *;
 [X]US6058897  (NAKAYOSHI HIDEKI [JP]) [X] 1-4,10 * abstract *;
 [X]US6053139  (EGUCHI KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,10 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0799977  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,10 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0799976  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,10 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0859130  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,10 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0896129  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,10 * abstract *