blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1254815

EP1254815 - Actuating mechanism for a parking brake [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.12.2006  [2006/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dietz-automotive GmbH & Co. KG
Eisenbahnstrasse 67
73265 Dettingen unter Teck / DE
[2003/15]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Dietz-Metall GmbH & Co. KG
Kelterstrasse 31
72669 Unterensingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bauer, Hans
Gutenberger Str. 20
73265 Dettingen/Teck / DE
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard
Patentanwaltskanzlei Ruckh
Jurastraße 1
73087 Bad Boll / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard, Dr.
Fabrikstrasse 18
73277 Owen/Teck / DE
Application number, filing date01123845.805.10.2001
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateDE20012007646U05.05.2001         Original published format: DE 20107646 U
[2002/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1254815
Date:06.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1254815
Date:04.02.2004
[2004/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1254815
Date:28.12.2005
Language:DE
[2005/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.2003
ClassificationIPC:B60T7/10
[2002/45]
CPC:
B60T7/102 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   LI [2004/44]
Former [2002/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Betätigungsvorrichtung für eine Feststellbremse[2002/45]
English:Actuating mechanism for a parking brake[2002/45]
French:Actionneur d'un frein de stationnement[2002/45]
Examination procedure17.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/12]
02.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2005Fee for grant paid
03.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5205184  (NOEL JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,16-21 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0933270  (FICO CABLES SA [ES]) [X] 1,2,4,16-21 * abstract *;
 [DA]DE19521159  (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [DA] 1,3 * abstract *;
 [PX]EP1127760  (DIETZ METALL GMBH & CO [DE]) [PX] 1-3,16-21 * abstract *;
 [E]EP1273495  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [E] 1-3,16-21 * abstract *
by applicantDE19521159
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.