Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1189453

EP1189453 - A method for encoding and decoding moving picture signals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  09.01.2009
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.2009Refusal of applicationpublished on 11.02.2009  [2009/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2008/39]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP
Former [2002/12]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Machida, Yutaka
14-13-401, Konan Chuodori, Konan-ku
Yokohama 233-0004 / JP
 [2002/19]
Former [2002/12]01 / Machida, Yutaka
1114-C101, Kami Sugeto-cho, Hodogaya-ku
Yokohama / JP
Representative(s)Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/12]Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date01124174.230.01.1996
[2002/12]
Priority number, dateJP1995001451431.01.1995         Original published format: JP 1451495
[2002/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1189453
Date:20.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/50
[2002/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/12]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Kodieren und Dekodieren von Bewegtbildsignalen[2002/12]
English:A method for encoding and decoding moving picture signals[2002/12]
French:Procédé de codage et décodage de signaux d'images en mouvement[2002/12]
Examination procedure20.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/43]
14.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/07]
04.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
22.09.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/07]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96300623.4  / EP0725545
Divisional application(s)EP08014200.3  / EP1991007
EP15188611.6   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 07.11.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
23.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
27.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
13.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
11.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
11.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 12
21.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[X]US5287178  (ACAMPORA ALFONSE A [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 7, line 50 - column 10, line 64 * * figures 5-7 *;
 [A]  "CODEC FOR AUDIOVISUAL SERVICES AT N X 384 KBIT/S", COMITE CONSULTATIF INTERNATIONAL TELEGRAPHIQUE TELEPHONIQUE RECOMMENDATION, (19881114), vol. 3, no. III.06, pages 120 - 128, XP000575342 [A] 1 * section 4 *
 [PA]  "TRANSMISSION OF NON-TELEPHONE SIGNALS. INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - GENERIC CODING OF MOVING PICTURES AND ASSOCIATED AUDIO INFORMATION: VIDEO", ITU-T TELECOMMUNICATION STANDARIZATION SECTOR OF ITU, (199507), pages A/B, I - VIII, 1 - 201, XP000198491 [PA] 1 * section 6.1.2, pages 20-21 * * section 6.2.4, page 34 * * section 6.3.16, pages 58-59 * * sections D.13.2.1, D.13.2.2, page 166 *