blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1201518

EP1201518 - Rapid tyre inflation plant [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BUTLER ENGINEERING & MARKETING S.r.l.
Via Balduina, 5/7
42010 Rio Saliceto (Reggio Emilia) / IT
[2004/06]
Former [2002/18]For all designated states
BUTLER ENGINEERING & MARKETING S.r.l.
Via Balduina, 5/7
I-42010 Rio Saliceto (Prov. of Reggio Emilia) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Gonzaga, Tullio
Via Canolo 1
42015 Correggio (Reggio Emilia) / IT
 [2002/18]
Representative(s)Reniero, Cirillo Silvano
Dr. Reniero & Associati S.r.l.
Patents
Piazza Bra, 28
37121 Verona / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Reniero, Cirillo Silvano
Dr. Reniero & Associati S.r.l. Patents Piazza Bra, 28
37121 Verona / IT
Former [2003/32]Reniero, Cirillo Silvano
c/o Dr.Reniero & Associati S.r.l. Via D. Manin, 5
37122 Verona / IT
Former [2002/18]Reniero, Cirillo Silvano
Reniero, Bergamini & Partners s.r.l., 21, Via A. Sciesa
37122 Verona / IT
Application number, filing date01124321.919.10.2001
[2002/18]
Priority number, dateIT2000VR0010830.10.2000         Original published format: IT VR000108
[2002/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1201518
Date:02.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1201518
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2002
ClassificationIPC:B60S5/04
[2002/18]
CPC:
B60S5/046 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/18]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum schnellen Aufpumpen von Reifen[2002/18]
English:Rapid tyre inflation plant[2002/18]
French:Dispositif pour le gonflage rapide de pneumatiques[2002/18]
Examination procedure18.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
06.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.11.2003Fee for grant paid
12.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.02.2004
TR04.02.2004
LU19.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
[2009/42]
Former [2007/09]CY04.02.2004
LU19.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/45]MC31.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH07127571  ;
 [A]DE3811648  (KRASCHIENSKI OLAF DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figure . * * column 1, line 33 - line 53 *;
 [YA]US6067850  (LANG YU [US], et al) [Y] 11 * column A; figure 1; claim . * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 54 * [A] 1;
 [XP]EP1072489  (BUTLER ENG & MARKETING [IT]) [XP] 1,11,12 * abstract * * page 4, line 24 - line 57 *;
 [XP]WO0170521  (EQUALAIRE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [XP] 1,11,12 * abstract ** page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 6 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, & JP07127571 A 19950516 (CHUGOKU YUKI SERVICE:KK) [X] 1,12 * abstract * [Y] 11
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.