Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1306050

EP1306050 - Microprobe with navigation system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BrainLAB AG
Ammerthalstrasse 8
85551 Kirchheim/Heimstetten / DE
[2003/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Hartlep, Andreas Dr.
Bismarckstrasse 16
80803 München / DE
 [2003/18]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date01124379.724.10.2001
[2003/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1306050
Date:02.05.2003
Language:DE
[2003/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1306050
Date:19.05.2004
Language:DE
[2004/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/04, A61B5/042, A61B19/00
[2003/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/18]
TitleGerman:Navigierte Mikrosonde[2003/18]
English:Microprobe with navigation system[2003/18]
French:Microsonde avec système de navigation[2003/18]
Examination procedure24.10.2001Examination requested  [2003/18]
24.10.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
16.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
13.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2004Fee for grant paid
10.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY19.05.2004
FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
NL19.05.2004
TR19.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
PT19.10.2004
LU24.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/09]CY19.05.2004
FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
NL19.05.2004
TR19.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
LU24.10.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2006/51]FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
NL19.05.2004
TR19.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2006/13]FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
NL19.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/45]FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
MC31.10.2004
Former [2005/19]FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
Former [2005/18]FI19.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
Former [2005/06]FI19.05.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
Former [2005/02]FI19.05.2004
SE19.08.2004
Former [2004/52]SE19.08.2004
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4461304  (KUPERSTEIN MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 1-8 * column 1, line 17 - line 20 * * column 2, line 19 - line 23 * * figures 1,4 *;
 [Y]WO9839669  (SONOMETRICS CORP [CA], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 27, line 13 - line 15 * * page 54, line 3 - line 22 *;
 [A]WO0176497  (MEDTRONIC SURGICAL NAVIGATION [US]) [A] 2,4-8 * page 6, line 16 - line 17 * * page 6, line 27 - line 28 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US2001027272  (SAITO AKITO [JP], et al) [A] 2,4-8 * page 2, paragraph 27 - paragraph 40 * * page 3, paragraph 48 * * page 4, paragraph 81 * * page 6, paragraph 126 * * page 7, paragraph 154 * * figures 1,6 *
ExaminationWO0149197