blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1199273

EP1199273 - Retard roller and sheet feeder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.06.2004
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.08.2004  [2004/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD.
1, Higashi 3-chome Komaki-shi
Aichi-ken, 485-8550 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/17]For all designated states
Tokai Rubber Industries, Ltd.
1, Higashi 3-chome
Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken, 485-8550 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshid, Yuma
Doerumarumo 202-2C, 2-177 Yayoi-cho
Kasugai-shi, Aichi-ken, 486-0838 / JP
02 / Wago, Yoshihiro
3-225 Wakabadai
Kani-shi, Gifu-ken, 509-0258 / JP
03 / Jwamoto, Yasuhiro
54-11 Yayoi-cho-aza-higashihouwa
Toyohashi-shi, Aichi-ken, 441-8106 / JP
04 / Sendo, Hideki
2-161-303 Nishiyutaka-machi
Toyokawa-shi, Aichi-ken, 442-0024 / JP
 [2002/17]
Representative(s)Frankland, Nigel Howard
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/17]Frankland, Nigel Howard
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date01124693.116.10.2001
[2002/17]
Priority number, dateJP2000031466016.10.2000         Original published format: JP 2000314660
[2002/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1199273
Date:24.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1199273
Date:28.04.2004
[2004/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2004
ClassificationIPC:B65H27/00, B65H3/52
[2002/17]
CPC:
B65H3/5215 (EP,US); B65H27/00 (EP,US); B65H2401/10 (EP,US);
B65H2404/1115 (EP,US); B65H2404/1312 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/17]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Trennrolle und Bogenzuführvorrichtung[2002/17]
English:Retard roller and sheet feeder[2002/17]
French:Rouleau séparateur et dispositif d'alimentation en papier[2002/17]
Examination procedure16.10.2001Examination requested  [2002/17]
09.06.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS57131651  ;
 [X]JPS59149246  ;
 [X]JPS58224929  ;
 [X]JPS6160558  ;
 [X]JPH10291677  ;
 [X]JPH0873094  ;
 [X]JP2000191200  ;
 [DX]JPH08108591  ;
 [X]US6077207  (YOKOYAMA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 6 - line 11; figure -; claim 12 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821118), vol. 006, no. 232, Database accession no. (M - 172), & JP57131651 A 19820814 (HOKUSHIN KOGYO KK) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841221), vol. 008, no. 280, Database accession no. (M - 347), & JP59149246 A 19840827 (IWASAKI TSUSHINKI KK) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840412), vol. 008, no. 080, Database accession no. (M - 289), & JP58224929 A 19831227 (CANON KK) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860807), vol. 010, no. 227, Database accession no. (M - 505), & JP61060558 A 19860328 (MUTOH IND LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10291677 A 19981104 (HARADA KOGYO:KK) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, & JP08073094 A 19960319 (PIOLAX INC) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, & JP2000191200 A 20000711 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [DX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, & JP08108591 A 19960430 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND LTD) [DX] 1 * abstract *
by applicantJPH05221059
 JPH08108591
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.