Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236672

EP1236672 - Balustrade for escalator or moving walkway [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 09.08.2006  [2006/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thyssen Fahrtreppen GmbH
Kolumbusstrasse 8
22113 Hamburg / DE
[2002/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Ludwig, Reiner
Emmerstieg 1
21493 Schwarzenbeck / DE
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Splanemann
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte
Rumfordstrasse 7
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date01124874.718.10.2001
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateDE2000218893U06.11.2000         Original published format: DE 20018893 U
[2002/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236672
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1236672
Date:15.12.2004
Language:DE
[2004/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:B66B23/22
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2003/21]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Balustrade für Fahrtreppe oder Fahrsteig[2002/36]
English:Balustrade for escalator or moving walkway[2002/36]
French:Balustrade pour escalier ou trottoir roulant[2002/36]
Examination procedure26.10.2002Examination requested  [2003/02]
07.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.2004Fee for grant paid
17.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR15.12.2004
GB15.12.2004
ES26.03.2005
[2006/32]
Former [2006/12]GB15.12.2004
ES26.03.2005
Documents cited:Search[XAY]JPH0616375  ;
 [YA]US3682289  (KRAFT JOSEPH K) [Y] 4,5 * abstract * [A] 1;
 [YA]US2656031  (MASEK WALTER F) [Y] 9 * figure 2 * [A] 1;
 [YA]EP0826622  (THYSSEN AUFZUEGE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 10,11 * column 5, line 15 - line 50; figure 2 * [A] 1;
 [YA]US3834513  (MIURA M, et al) [Y] 13 * figures 6,8 * [A] 1
 [XAY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940422), vol. 018, no. 224, Database accession no. (M - 1596), [X] 1-3,6 * abstract * [A] 7,8,12 [Y] 4,5,9-11,13