blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1205425

EP1205425 - Industrial truck with an independent wheel suspension [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2007
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STILL GmbH
Berzeliusstrasse 10
22113 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/20]For all designated states
STILL GMBH
Berzeliusstrasse 10
D-22113 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bavendiek, Rainer, Dr.-Ing.
Hohler Weg 13
21465 Wentorf / DE
02 / Biermann, Thorsten, Dipl.-Ing.
Jüthornstrasse 52
22043 Hamburg / DE
03 / Bruns, Rainer, Prof.Dr.-Ing.
Kirchenheide 18
22395 Hamburg / DE
 [2002/20]
Representative(s)Lang, Michael, et al
Linde AG
Zentrale Patentabteilung
D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/20]Lang, Michael (DE), et al
Linde AG Zentrale Patentabteilung
D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
Application number, filing date01125215.224.10.2001
[2002/20]
Priority number, dateDE200015575110.11.2000         Original published format: DE 10055751
[2002/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1205425
Date:15.05.2002
Language:DE
[2002/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1205425
Date:21.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2002
ClassificationIPC:B66F9/075, B60K7/00
[2002/20]
CPC:
B60K17/16 (EP); B66F9/07586 (EP); B60K17/043 (EP);
B60K2001/001 (EP); B60Y2200/15 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2003/06]
Former [2002/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Flurförderzeug mit einer Einzelradaufhängung[2002/20]
English:Industrial truck with an independent wheel suspension[2002/20]
French:Chariot de manutention avec une suspension à roue indépendante[2002/20]
Examination procedure21.10.2002Examination requested  [2003/01]
22.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.2006Fee for grant paid
27.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR21.06.2006
GB21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2007/36]GB21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
Former [2007/27]GB21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
Former [2006/48]SE21.09.2006
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE1790386U  (IRION & VOSSELER [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-10,13 * the whole document * [Y] 11,12,14-16;
 [Y]DE19524524  (STILL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 11,12 * column 3, lines 28-49 *;
 [Y]GB2261411  (VALMET TRANSMEC LTD OY [FI]) [Y] 14-16 * page 4, line 19 - page 7, line 32 *;
 [X]FR1066297  (YALE & TOWNE MFG CO) [X] 1-5,8,9,12 * the whole document *;
 [AD]FR2504905  (FENWICK MANUTENTION STE INDLE [FR]);
 [A]DE1913526  (EATON YALE & TOWNE GMBH)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.