Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1202071

EP1202071 - Voltage measurement apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.02.2005
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/18]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takada, Masahiro
5-55, Aza Kitagonaka, Iwatacho
Toyohashi-shi, Aichi 431-0452 / JP
02 / Morimoto, Naohisa
B-102, Kasaodakano, 2-5-5, Nishiodakano
Toyohashi-shi, Aichi 440-0013 / JP
 [2002/18]
Representative(s)Balsters, Robert , et al
Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Balsters, Robert , et al
Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25
1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH
Former [2002/18]Balsters, Robert , et al
Novagraaf SA 25, Avenue du Pailly
1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH
Application number, filing date01125337.426.10.2001
[2002/18]
Priority number, dateJP2000033402631.10.2000         Original published format: JP 2000334026
[2002/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1202071
Date:02.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1202071
Date:25.09.2002
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1202071
Date:07.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/36, G01R15/16, G01R19/00
[2002/39]
Former International [2002/18]G01R31/36, G01R15/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/24]
Former [2002/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Spannungsmessgerät[2002/18]
English:Voltage measurement apparatus[2002/18]
French:Appareil de mesure de tension[2002/18]
Examination procedure23.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/51]
24.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.02.2004Fee for grant paid
05.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XD]EP0990913  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [XD] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] - [0069] - [0071] - [0087] , [0088] , [0097] - [0099] *