Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1207389

EP1207389 - Karl-Fischer-Reagent [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  16.01.2009
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sigma-Aldrich Laborchemikalien GmbH
Wunstorfer Strasse 40
30926 Seelze / DE
[2002/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Schöffski, Katrin Dr.
Am Schatzkampe 4
30163 Hannover / DE
02 / Hoffmann, Helga
An der Südaue 12
31515 Wunstorf / DE
 [2002/21]
Representative(s)Bublak, Wolfgang , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/22]Bublak, Wolfgang, Dr. , et al
Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler, Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2002/21]Ricker, Mathias, Dr.Dipl.-Chem.
Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg- Geissler, Isenbruck, Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date01125451.305.11.2001
[2002/21]
Priority number, dateDE200015654715.11.2000         Original published format: DE 10056547
[2002/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1207389
Date:22.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1207389
Date:11.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/02]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1207389
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01N31/16, G01N33/18
[2002/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/21]
TitleGerman:Karl-Fischer-Reagenz[2002/21]
English:Karl-Fischer-Reagent[2002/21]
French:Réactif de Karl-Fischer[2002/21]
Examination procedure07.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/32]
30.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
10.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2005Fee for grant paid
12.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.10.2006   
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach
64271 Darmstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Horstmann, Stefan
Merck Patent GmbH
Patents Chemicals
Frankfurter Str. 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/46]
Opponent(s)01  11.10.2006   
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach
D-64271 Darmstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Horstmann, Stefan
Merck Patent GmbH Patents Chemicals Frankfurter Str. 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
23.11.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.03.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.02.2008Date of oral proceedings
25.03.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.04.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.04.2008Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.09.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
12.12.2008Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
CY11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
TR11.01.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
GR12.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
LU05.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
IT05.11.2007
[2009/37]
Former [2009/03]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
CY11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
TR11.01.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
GR12.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
LU05.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2008/37]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
TR11.01.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
GR12.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
LU05.11.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2008/19]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
GR12.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2007/50]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2007/37]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
IT11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
MC30.11.2006
Former [2007/36]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
IT11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2007/13]AT11.01.2006
BE11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2007/09]AT11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
ES22.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2006/51]AT11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
DK11.04.2006
SE11.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2006/48]AT11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
SE11.04.2006
PT12.06.2006
Former [2006/46]AT11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
SE11.04.2006
Former [2006/43]AT11.01.2006
CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
Former [2006/42]CH11.01.2006
FI11.01.2006
LI11.01.2006
Former [2006/36]FI11.01.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]US5567618  (SCHOLZ EUGEN [DE]) [X] 1,5,7-10 * examples 6,7; claims 1-4 *;
 [XY]US5139955  (SCHOLZ EUGEN [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-10 * column 2, lines 3-12 * * column 4, lines 50-52 * * column 3, lines 13-35; examples 1,2; claim 1 * [Y] 6;
 [Y]US5962328  (KATO HIROMASA [JP], et al) [Y] 6 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 57; example 3; claims 1,4 *;
 [PX]WO0072003  (CEDERGREN ANDERS [SE], et al) [PX] 1-3,5,7-10 * page 2, lines 13-34 * * page 1, lines 1-5 *
 [A]  MACLEOD S K, "MOISTURE DETERMINATION USING KARL FISCHER TITRATIONS", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (19910515), vol. 63, no. 10, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 557A - 558A,560-6A, XP000217463 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *