EP1317053 - Overvoltage compensator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states aixcon Elektrotechnik GmbH Steinfurt 26 52222 Stolberg / DE | [2003/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swiontek, Karl Langer Morgen 4 52224 Stolberg / DE | 02 /
Gerads, Georg Friedenstrasse 64 52060 Aachen / DE | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Springorum, Harald, et al Kiani & Springorum Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Taubenstrasse 4 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Springorum, Harald, Dr., et al Kiani & Springorum, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Heinrich-Heine-Allee 29 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01125922.3 | 30.10.2001 | [2003/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1317053 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/15 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
H02M1/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/23] | Title | German: | Überspannungskompensator | [2003/23] | English: | Overvoltage compensator | [2003/23] | French: | Compensateur de surtensions | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/42] | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5712774 (URAMOTO HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US6021054 (UEKI KOUICHI [JP]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1,2,5,9 * * column 2, line 3 - line 56 *; | [X]WO9619037 (SIEMENS AG OESTERREICH [AT], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 33 *; | [X]JPH03143260 ; | [X]JPH08168256 ; | [A]JPH05168249 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910913), vol. 015, no. 365, Database accession no. (E - 1111), & JP03143260 A 19910618 (TOSHIBA CORP.) [X] 1-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08168256 A 19960625 (MURATA MFG.) [X] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931020), vol. 017, no. 578, Database accession no. (E - 1450), & JP05168249 A 19930702 (TOSHIBA CORP.) [A] 1 * abstract * |