blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1190808

EP1190808 - Friction stir welding method, and a composite body produced thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  28.08.2009
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Opposition rejectedpublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/04]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
Former [2005/38]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
Former [2002/13]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Aota, Kinya
32-28, Kuji-cho 6-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1222 / JP
02 / Takenaka, Tsuyoshi
365-28, Syukui, Tabuse-cho
Kumage-gun, Yamaguchi-ken / JP
03 / Ishimaru, Yasuo
1-27, Higashitokimune, Ikunoya
Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP
 [2005/36]
Former [2002/17]01 / Aota, Kinya
32-28, Kuju-cho 6-chome
Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1222 / JP
02 / Takenaka, Tsuyoshi
365-28, Syukui, Tabuse-cho
Kumage-gun, Yamaguchi-ken / JP
03 / Ishimaru, Yasuo
1-27, Higashitokimune, Ikunoya
Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP
Former [2002/13]01 / Aota, Kinya
1680-2, Nishitoyoi
Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP
02 / Takenaka, Tsuyoshi
365-28, Syukui, Tabuse-cho
Kumage-gun, Yamaguchi-ken / JP
03 / Ishimaru, Yasuo
1-27, Higashitokimune, Ikunoya
Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/13]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date01126193.019.03.1997
[2002/13]
Priority number, dateJP1996006249119.03.1996         Original published format: JP 6249196
[2002/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1190808
Date:27.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1190808
Date:03.04.2002
[2002/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1190808
Date:25.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2002
ClassificationIPC:B23K20/12, F16S1/02
[2002/13]
CPC:
B61D17/043 (EP,US); B23K20/12 (KR); B23K20/122 (EP,US);
B23K20/123 (EP,US); B23K20/126 (EP,US); B23K33/00 (EP,US);
B23K33/004 (EP,US); E04C2/08 (EP,US); E04C2/36 (EP,US);
E04C2/543 (EP,US); B23K2101/045 (EP,US); Y10T428/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1234 (EP,US); Y10T428/12375 (EP,US); Y10T428/12382 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12493 (EP,US); Y10T428/192 (EP,US); Y10T428/24777 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2002/13]
TitleGerman:Drehendes Reibungschweissverfahren und Verbundkörper[2002/13]
English:Friction stir welding method, and a composite body produced thereby[2002/13]
French:Méthode de soudage par friction à mouvement cyclique et corps composite obtenu[2002/13]
Examination procedure27.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/48]
31.03.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
20.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2005Fee for grant paid
24.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97301870.8  / EP0797043
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.10.2006  02.11.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/48]
Opponent(s)01  24.10.2006   
Siemens Abteilung: CT IP TS
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
29.11.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.02.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
08.05.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.05.2008Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
04.08.2009Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2009/40]
Appeal following opposition02.07.2008Appeal received No.  T1270/08
05.09.2008Statement of grounds filed
04.08.2009Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
04.08.2009Date of oral proceedings
07.08.2009Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/36]IT25.01.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0579500  (HITACHI LTD [JP]);
 [X]  - DAWES C J ET AL, "FRICTION STIR PROCESS WELDS ALUMINUM ALLOYS", WELDING JOURNAL, AMERICAN WELDING SOCIETY. MIAMI, US, (19960301), vol. 75, no. 3, ISSN 0043-2296, pages 41 - 45, XP000587301 [X] 1,2,5 * figure 7D *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.