Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1203925

EP1203925 - Roughness measuring method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOKYO SEIMITSU CO., LTD.
7-1, Shimorenjaku 9-chome Mitaka-shi
Tokyo / JP
[2009/07]
Former [2002/19]For all designated states
TOKYO SEIMITSU CO., LTD.
7-1, Shimorenjaku 9-chome
Mitaka-shi Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kume, Shigefumi
7-1, Shimorenjaku 9-chome
Mitake-shi, Tokyo / JP
 [2002/19]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/19]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01126295.306.11.2001
[2002/19]
Priority number, dateJP2000033788006.11.2000         Original published format: JP 2000337880
[2002/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1203925
Date:08.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1203925
Date:31.03.2004
[2004/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1203925
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:G01B7/34
[2002/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2004/52]
Former [2002/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Rauhigkeit-Messverfahren und Apparat[2002/19]
English:Roughness measuring method and apparatus[2002/19]
French:Méthode de mesure de la rugosité et appareil[2002/19]
Examination procedure10.08.2004Examination requested  [2004/41]
01.10.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
25.01.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
11.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2008Fee for grant paid
19.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
26.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.11.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
09.11.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2117898  (FIAT VEICOLI IND) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]US5420796  (WELING MILIND [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * claims 1-18 *;
 [A]EP0359378  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 5 - column 6 *;
 [A]US5955654  (STOVER JOHN C [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]US4803374  (MONFORT GUY A [BE], et al) [A] 3 * column 4 - column 5 *;
 [A]US5355221  (COHEN DONALD K [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 4 - column 13 *;
 [A]US4665739  (MIZUNO SATOSHI [JP]) [A] 4 * claims 1-7 *;
 [A]US5528799  (BACH JOSEF [DE], et al) [A] 6 * column 3 - column 5 *