Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1215630

EP1215630 - Airline check-in method in an airport [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.06.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 05.09.2007  [2007/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V.
Linder Höhe
51147 Köln / DE
[2002/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Angermann, Michael, Dipl.-Ing.
Rottenbucherstrasse 19a
82166 Gräfelfing / DE
02 / Steingass, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing.
Am Gemeindeholz 2a
82205 Gilching / DE
03 / Robertson, Patrick, Dr.
Klosterweg 12
82541 Ammerland / DE
 [2002/25]
Representative(s)von Kirschbaum, Albrecht
Patentanwalt
Postfach 1520
82102 Germering / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/25]von Kirschbaum, Albrecht, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Postfach 15 20
82102 Germering / DE
Application number, filing date01126401.707.11.2001
[2002/25]
Priority number, dateDE200016272615.12.2000         Original published format: DE 10062726
[2002/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1215630
Date:19.06.2002
Language:DE
[2002/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1215630
Date:27.11.2002
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1215630
Date:03.08.2005
Language:DE
[2005/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:G07B15/00, G06F17/60
[2002/48]
Former International [2002/25]G07B15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/33]
Former [2002/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Durchführen eines Check-In-Vorgangs in Flughäfen[2002/25]
English:Airline check-in method in an airport[2002/25]
French:Méthode d'enregistrement de passagers dans un aéroport[2002/25]
Examination procedure16.10.2002New documents discovered [2002/49]
12.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
18.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2005Fee for grant paid
01.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI03.08.2005
IE03.08.2005
IT03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
TR03.08.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
AT07.11.2005
CY07.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
BE30.11.2005
CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
[2007/36]
Former [2007/23]FI03.08.2005
IE03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
TR03.08.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
AT07.11.2005
CY07.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
BE30.11.2005
CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2007/20]FI03.08.2005
IE03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
TR03.08.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
CY07.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
BE30.11.2005
CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2007/13]FI03.08.2005
IE03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
TR03.08.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
BE30.11.2005
CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2007/09]FI03.08.2005
IE03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
TR03.08.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/51]FI03.08.2005
IE03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
TR03.08.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/42]FI03.08.2005
IE03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
CH30.11.2005
LI30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/30]FI03.08.2005
IE03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/26]FI03.08.2005
IE03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
DK03.11.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/25]FI03.08.2005
IE03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
PT03.01.2006
Former [2006/14]FI03.08.2005
NL03.08.2005
GR03.11.2005
SE03.11.2005
ES14.11.2005
Former [2006/13]FI03.08.2005
SE03.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0074406  (DUHS HENRY [SE]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 11 - page 3, line 17 * * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 19 * * page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 7, line 21 - page 10, line 19 *;
 [Y]WO9952316  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 16 - line 30 * * page 9, line 14 - page 10, line 8 *;
 [A]US6127917  (TUTTLE JOHN R [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 15, line 60 - column 17, line 41 *;
 [A]WO0062260  (SWISSCOM AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 7 * * page 6, line 1 - line 11 * * page 7, line 8 - line 16 * * page 12, line 21 - page 14, line 14 *
 [Y]  "Mobilocity, Mobile Travel Services, Strategies for moving forward", MOBILOCITY, (200012), XP002199678 [Y] 1-10 * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 13, paragraph 5 * * page 15, paragraph 6 *
Examination   "Jini Architectural Overview", SUN MICROSYSTEM ICG WHITE PAPER, (199901), XP002264752
by applicantDE19733507