Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1216905

EP1216905 - Method and device for pressure signal offset compensation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2007
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 19.12.2007  [2007/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2006/52]
Former [2002/26]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Braun, Thomas
Haydnweg 11
71711 Murr / DE
 [2002/26]
Application number, filing date01126749.909.11.2001
[2002/26]
Priority number, dateDE200016502223.12.2000         Original published format: DE 10065022
[2002/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1216905
Date:26.06.2002
Language:DE
[2002/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1216905
Date:11.12.2002
[2002/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1216905
Date:27.12.2006
Language:DE
[2006/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/88, B60T8/00
[2002/50]
Former International [2002/26]B60T8/88
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/36]
Former [2002/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abgleichen des Offset eines Druckwertes[2002/26]
English:Method and device for pressure signal offset compensation[2002/26]
French:Procédé et dispositif de compensation de décalage pour un capteur de pression[2002/26]
Examination procedure11.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/33]
14.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2006Fee for grant paid
10.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB27.12.2006
[2007/51]
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE19914403  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3,7,9,12 * column 2, line 20 - column 2, line 47; figure 2 * [Y] 2,5,6,13;
 [Y]JPH1191549  ;
 [A]US5304941  (TATEISHI TETUO [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0758739  (MOTOROLA SEMICONDUCTEURS [FR]) [A] 1-13 * page 5, line 5 - page 7, line 8; figure 1 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, [Y] 2,5,6,13 * abstract *