blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1205378

EP1205378 - Stand device for a two-wheel vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2007
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 12.12.2007  [2007/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha
2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/28]For all designated states
YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2500 Shingai Iwata-shi
Shizuoka-ken / JP
Former [2002/20]For all designated states
YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamada, Kazunori
Yamaha Hatsudoki K.K., 2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
02 / Kishimoto, Eiji
Yamaha Hatsudoki K.K., 2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
03 / Takada, Kazuyoshi
Yamaha Hatsudoki K.K., 2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
 [2006/15]
Former [2002/20]01 / Yamada, Kazunori
Yamada Hatsudoki K.K., 2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
02 / Kishimoto, Eiji
Yamada Hatsudoki K.K., 2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
03 / Takada, Kazuyoshi
Yamada Hatsudoki K.K., 2500 Shingai
Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/20]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01126792.909.11.2001
[2002/20]
Priority number, dateJP2000034128209.11.2000         Original published format: JP 2000341282
[2002/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1205378
Date:15.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1205378
Date:14.01.2004
[2004/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1205378
Date:12.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2003
ClassificationIPC:B62H1/02, B62H1/06
[2004/03]
CPC:
B62H1/02 (EP)
Former IPC [2002/20]B62H1/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/41]
Former [2002/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Standvorrichtung für ein Zweiradfahrzeug[2002/20]
English:Stand device for a two-wheel vehicle[2002/20]
French:Dispositif de support automatique pour deux roues[2002/20]
Examination procedure13.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/12]
28.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2006Fee for grant paid
18.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/50]
Former [2007/36]IT12.07.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]DE581754  (KURT RILL) [X] 1-9* the whole document *
by applicantJPS5110536
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.