Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1208793

EP1208793 - Implantable medical device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.05.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.06.2006  [2006/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
St. Jude Medical AB
175 84 Järfälla / SE
[2002/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Norén, Kjell
Karolinagatan 10 C, nb
171 58 Solna / SE
02 / Kjellman, Charlotte
Storskärsgatan 6
115 29 Stockholm / SE
03 / Nilsson, Kenth
Trälhavsvägen 42
184 60 Akersberga / SE
04 / Hedberg, Sven-Erik
Odonstigen 5
196 32 Kungsängen / SE
 [2002/22]
Application number, filing date01126936.213.11.2001
[2002/22]
Priority number, dateSE2000000422416.11.2000         Original published format: SE 0004224
[2002/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1208793
Date:29.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1208793
Date:13.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/0215, A61N1/365
[2002/22]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [2003/08]
Former [2002/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Implantierbares medizinisches Gerät[2002/22]
English:Implantable medical device[2002/22]
French:Dispositif médical implantable[2002/22]
Examination procedure29.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/05]
27.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2005Fee for grant paid
09.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[AD]US5368040  (CARNEY JAMES K [US]) [AD] 1-5 * column 2, line 51 - line 63 * * column 5, line 1 - line 6 *;
 [A]US5626623  (KIEVAL ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 40 - line 49 * * column 11, line 3 - line 15 *;
 [A]US5105810  (COLLINS KENNETH A [AU], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 7, line 42 - line 50 *
by applicantUS5040540
 US5843135
 US5324326
 US5163429
 US5368040
 US5871509