Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1238823

EP1238823 - Process for covering bodies with diamond patterns and machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/37]Process for covering bodies with diamond patterns
[2006/35]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.12.2007
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.12.2017  [2017/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daisy s.r.l.
Via dell'Astronautica, 12
36016 Thiene (Vicenza) / IT
[2002/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Dal Dosso, Elena
Via Alteo, 29
36030 Fara Vicentino (Vicenza) / IT
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Bettello, Pietro , et al
Studio Tecnico
Ingg. Luigi e Pietro Bettello
Via Col d'Echele, 25
36100 Vicenza / IT
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]Bettello, Pietro, Dott. Ing. , et al
Studio Tecnico Ingg. Luigi e Pietro Bettello Via Col d'Echele, 25
36100 Vicenza / IT
Application number, filing date01127113.715.11.2001
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateIT2000VI0024308.11.2000         Original published format: IT VI20000243
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1238823
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1238823
Date:06.11.2002
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1238823
Date:31.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:B44C1/24, B44C3/08, B44B5/00, B44B5/02, B44C1/17, A44C27/00
[2002/40]
Former International [2002/37]B44C1/24, B44C3/08, B44B5/00, B44B5/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/37]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Beschichtung eines Formkörpers mit Diamantprägung und Maschine[2006/35]
English:Process for covering bodies with diamond patterns and machine[2006/35]
French:Procédé pour recouvrir un article avec motifs en forme de diamant et machine[2006/35]
Former [2002/37]Verfahren zur Beschichtung eines Formkörpers mit Diamantprägung
Former [2002/37]Process for covering bodies with diamond patterns
Former [2002/37]Procédé pour recouvrir un article avec motifs en forme de diamant
Examination procedure28.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/27]
19.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2006Fee for grant paid
17.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.01.2007
BE31.01.2007
CH31.01.2007
CY31.01.2007
DK31.01.2007
FI31.01.2007
FR31.01.2007
LI31.01.2007
NL31.01.2007
TR31.01.2007
SE30.04.2007
DE01.05.2007
GR01.05.2007
ES12.05.2007
PT02.07.2007
[2017/51]
Former [2015/21]AT31.01.2007
BE31.01.2007
CH31.01.2007
CY31.01.2007
DK31.01.2007
FI31.01.2007
FR31.01.2007
LI31.01.2007
NL31.01.2007
TR31.01.2007
SE30.04.2007
DE01.05.2007
GR01.05.2007
ES12.05.2007
PT02.07.2007
Former [2009/42]AT31.01.2007
BE31.01.2007
CH31.01.2007
CY31.01.2007
DK31.01.2007
FI31.01.2007
FR31.01.2007
LI31.01.2007
NL31.01.2007
TR31.01.2007
SE30.04.2007
DE01.05.2007
GR01.05.2007
ES12.05.2007
PT02.07.2007
Former [2009/33]AT31.01.2007
BE31.01.2007
CH31.01.2007
CY31.01.2007
DK31.01.2007
FI31.01.2007
FR31.01.2007
LI31.01.2007
NL31.01.2007
SE30.04.2007
DE01.05.2007
GR01.05.2007
ES12.05.2007
PT02.07.2007
Former [2008/52]AT31.01.2007
BE31.01.2007
CH31.01.2007
DK31.01.2007
FI31.01.2007
FR31.01.2007
LI31.01.2007
NL31.01.2007
SE30.04.2007
DE01.05.2007
GR01.05.2007
ES12.05.2007
PT02.07.2007
Former [2008/23]AT31.01.2007
BE31.01.2007
CH31.01.2007
DK31.01.2007
FI31.01.2007
LI31.01.2007
NL31.01.2007
SE30.04.2007
DE01.05.2007
GR01.05.2007
ES12.05.2007
PT02.07.2007
FR21.09.2007
Former [2008/19]AT31.01.2007
BE31.01.2007
CH31.01.2007
DK31.01.2007
FI31.01.2007
LI31.01.2007
NL31.01.2007
SE30.04.2007
DE01.05.2007
GR01.05.2007
ES12.05.2007
PT02.07.2007
Former [2008/09]AT31.01.2007
BE31.01.2007
CH31.01.2007
DK31.01.2007
FI31.01.2007
LI31.01.2007
NL31.01.2007
SE30.04.2007
DE01.05.2007
ES12.05.2007
PT02.07.2007
Former [2008/01]AT31.01.2007
BE31.01.2007
CH31.01.2007
DK31.01.2007
FI31.01.2007
LI31.01.2007
NL31.01.2007
SE30.04.2007
ES12.05.2007
PT02.07.2007
Former [2007/48]AT31.01.2007
CH31.01.2007
DK31.01.2007
FI31.01.2007
LI31.01.2007
NL31.01.2007
SE30.04.2007
ES12.05.2007
PT02.07.2007
Former [2007/46]AT31.01.2007
CH31.01.2007
DK31.01.2007
FI31.01.2007
LI31.01.2007
NL31.01.2007
SE30.04.2007
ES12.05.2007
Former [2007/39]CH31.01.2007
FI31.01.2007
LI31.01.2007
NL31.01.2007
SE30.04.2007
ES12.05.2007
Former [2007/38]CH31.01.2007
FI31.01.2007
LI31.01.2007
SE30.04.2007
Former [2007/37]CH31.01.2007
FI31.01.2007
LI31.01.2007
Former [2007/36]FI31.01.2007
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3231455  (CAMPBELL III JAMES D, et al) [X] 11 * column 1, line 11 - column 9, line 62; figures 1-21 * [Y] 1;
 [YA]GB458562  (FELIX BLOIS) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 8 - page 2, line 117; figures 1-9 * [A] 2-14;
 [X]WO9303646  (LAMPERT DENNIS [US], et al) [X] 12 * see abstract; page 3, line 2 - page 10, line L; figures 1-12 *;
 [A]DE2200016  (PETRIKOWSKIJ EFIM L WOWITSCH) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE39901  (H. STÜBNER) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE236188  (FA. E. GERSPACHER) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE189440  (PETER SCHMITZ) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4754535  (VALTIERO TIZZI [IT]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2201358  (DUGGINS PATRICK JAMES, et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *