blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1223073

EP1223073 - Gear drive unit, particularly for a seat adjustment or a power steering system, with at least a support element [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.11.2009
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.04.2011  [2011/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2009/01]
Former [2002/29]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wiesler, Martin
Schartenbergstrasse 60a
76534 Baden-Baden / DE
02 / Winter, Manfred
Seestrasse 1
77839 Lichtenau / DE
03 / Schmidt, Willi
Frau-Holle-Weg 1
76297 Stutensee-Buechig / DE
04 / Peter, Gilles
Rue Des Dominicains 27
67500 Haguenau / FR
05 / Lienig, Andreas
Honaustrasse 27C
77815 Buehl / DE
 [2009/01]
Former [2002/29]01 / Wiesler, Martin
Schartenbergstrasse 60a
76534 Baden-Baden / DE
02 / Winter, Martin
Seestrasse 1
77839 Lichtenau / DE
03 / Schmidt, Willi
Frau-Holle-Weg 1
76297 Stutensee-Buechig / DE
04 / Peter, Gilles
Rue Des Dominicains 27
67500 Haguenau / FR
05 / Lienig, Andreas
Honaustrasse 27C
77815 Buehl / DE
Application number, filing date01128226.628.11.2001
[2002/29]
Priority number, dateDE200016339119.12.2000         Original published format: DE 10063391
DE200113905108.08.2001         Original published format: DE 10139051
[2002/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1223073
Date:17.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1223073
Date:02.01.2003
[2003/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1223073
Date:31.12.2008
Language:DE
[2009/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2002
ClassificationIPC:B60N2/02
[2002/29]
CPC:
F16H57/025 (EP,US); B60N2/0224 (EP,US); B60N2/02253 (EP,US);
B60N2/929 (EP,US); F16C17/10 (EP); F16C33/046 (EP);
F16C2326/08 (EP); F16H1/16 (EP,US); Y10T74/18664 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT [2003/39]
Former [2002/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Getriebe-Antriebseinheit, insbesondere für eine Sitzverstellung oder Servolenkung, mit mindestens einem Abstützelement[2002/29]
English:Gear drive unit, particularly for a seat adjustment or a power steering system, with at least a support element[2002/29]
French:Unité transmission-entraînement pour le réglage d'un siège ou une direction assistée, avec au moins un élément de support[2002/29]
Examination procedure02.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/36]
13.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.2008Fee for grant paid
14.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.10.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT31.12.2008
ES11.04.2009
[2011/14]
Former [2009/33]ES11.04.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3726801  (TEVES GMBH CO OHG ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * column W *;
 [AD]EP0759374  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 [A]DE19709852  (KEIPER GMBH & CO [DE])
by applicantDE3726801
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.