Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1213195

EP1213195 - Seat belt retractor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TAKATA CORPORATION
4-30, Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 106-8510 / JP
[2006/20]
Former [2002/24]For all designated states
TAKATA CORPORATION
4-30, Roppongi 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 106-8510 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hiramatsu, Koji
c/o Takata Corporation, 4-30 Roppongi 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 106-8510 / JP
02 / Yamanishi, Takahiro
c/o Takata Corporation, 4-30 Roppongi 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 106-8510 / JP
 [2002/24]
Representative(s)Banzer, Hans-Jörg , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/24]Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date01128469.206.12.2001
[2002/24]
Priority number, dateJP2000037457508.12.2000         Original published format: JP 2000374575
JP2001009238128.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001092381
JP2001023916507.08.2001         Original published format: JP 2001239165
[2002/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1213195
Date:12.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1213195
Date:25.06.2003
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1213195
Date:17.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B60R22/34, B60R22/46
[2002/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2004/12]
Former [2002/24]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Sicherheitsgurtaufroller[2002/24]
English:Seat belt retractor[2002/24]
French:Rétracteur de ceinture de sécurité[2002/24]
Examination procedure22.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
17.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2006Fee for grant paid
20.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0962366  (TRW REPA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 7, paragraph L - column 8, paragraph L; figures 1,13-15 * [Y] 3,4;
 [Y]US3927846  (MEISSNER WOLFGANG) [Y] 3,4 * column 6, lines 42-55; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US5967442  (WIER FRANZ [DE]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1022201  (BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECH [US]) [A] 1 * column 6, lines 25-56; figure 4 *;
 [A]WO9942343  (TRW REPA GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph L; figures 2,3,5 *;
 [A]US5967441  (KOHLNDORFER KENNETH H [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *