blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1211080

EP1211080 - Ink, ink-jet ink, ink tank, ink-jet cartridge, ink supply device, method for introducing ink to ink tank and image recording device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.08.2009
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 22.02.2012  [2012/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/23]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2 Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sato, Shinichi, Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Kurata, Tetsuji, Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
 [2002/23]
Representative(s)Weser, Wolfgang
Weser & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/23]Weser, Wolfgang, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Application number, filing date01128522.829.11.2001
[2002/23]
Priority number, dateJP2000036368529.11.2000         Original published format: JP 2000363685
[2002/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1211080
Date:05.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1211080
Date:03.09.2003
[2003/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1211080
Date:15.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2003
ClassificationIPC:B41J2/175
[2002/23]
CPC:
B41J3/445 (EP,US); B41J2/17513 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/23]
TitleGerman:Tinte, Tintenstrahltinte, Tintenbehälter, Tintenstrahlpatrone, Tintenzufuhrvorrichtung, Verfahren zur Tinteneinführung in einen Tintenbehälter und Bildaufzeichnungsgerät[2002/32]
English:Ink, ink-jet ink, ink tank, ink-jet cartridge, ink supply device, method for introducing ink to ink tank and image recording device[2002/23]
French:Encre, encre pour l'enregistrement par jet d'encre, réservoir d'encre, cartouche d'enregistrement à jet d'encre, système d'alimentation en encre, procédé d'introduction d'encre dans un réservoir d'encre, dispositif d'enregistrement d'image[2002/23]
Former [2002/23]Tinte, Tintenstrahltinte, Tintenbehälter, Tintenstrahlpatrone, Tintenzufuhrvorrichtung, Verfahren zur Tinteeinführung in einem Tintenbehälter und Bildaufzeichnungsgerät
Examination procedure23.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/13]
27.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2008Fee for grant paid
02.09.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CY15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
TR15.10.2008
IE29.11.2008
LU29.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
FR15.12.2008
SE15.01.2009
GR16.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
[2012/08]
Former [2010/47]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CY15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
TR15.10.2008
IE29.11.2008
LU29.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
SE15.01.2009
GR16.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2010/37]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CY15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
TR15.10.2008
IE29.11.2008
LU29.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
SE15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2010/34]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
CY15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
IE29.11.2008
LU29.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
SE15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2010/32]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
IE29.11.2008
LU29.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
SE15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/49]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
IE29.11.2008
CH30.11.2008
LI30.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
SE15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/47]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
IE29.11.2008
MC30.11.2008
SE15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/39]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
IT15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
SE15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/38]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
SE15.01.2009
ES26.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/34]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
DK15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
ES26.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/32]AT15.10.2008
BE15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
ES26.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/29]AT15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
MC30.11.2008
ES26.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/25]AT15.10.2008
FI15.10.2008
NL15.10.2008
ES26.01.2009
PT16.03.2009
Former [2009/23]AT15.10.2008
ES26.01.2009
Former [2009/20]ES26.01.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]US4383263  (OZAWA MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 15-18 * abstract ** column 2, line 55 - column 7, line 12; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US4968998  (ALLEN ROSS R [US]) [X] 15-18 * abstract * * column 4, line 45 - column 6, line 21; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0641594  (GORE & ASS [US], et al) [A] 1-14,19-31,34,35 * the whole document *;
 [XY]EP0646465  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 19,20,23 * page 13; table 1 * [Y] 25;
 [XY]EP0684136  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,11,31 * abstract * * page 2, lines 22-28 * * page 7, lines 25-43; claim 2 * * page 9, lines 38-40; figures 12,13 * * page 9, line 25 * [Y] 25,26;
 [A]US5657891  (BILANI NADY [BE], et al) [A] 1-14,25-31,34,35 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0803364  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-14,19-31,34,35 * page 13, column 22, lines 14-18; figure 12 * * page 6, column 8, lines 13-15; figure 2A *;
 [YA]EP0906830  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 26 * page 2, lines 39-45 * * page 13, lines 1-28; figures 11-14 * * the whole document * * page 3, line 47 * * page 13, lines 1-28; figures 11-14 * [A] 1-14,19-25,27-31,34,35
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.