Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316598

EP1316598 - Adhesive polymer composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2011
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Borealis Technology Oy
P.O. Box 330
06101 Porvoo / FI
[2010/20]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Borealis Technology Oy
P.O.Box 330
06101 Porvoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / Anker, Martin
De Geersgatan 6
416 57 Göteborg / SE
02 / Leidén, Leif
Hemängsvägen 28
07130 Andersböle / FI
03 / Rydin, Cecilia
Krukmakarevägen 2
444 95 Ödsmal / SE
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Kador & Partner PartG mbB
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Kador & Partner
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date01128537.629.11.2001
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1316598
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1316598
Date:19.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:C09J151/06
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
TitleGerman:Polymerer Klebstoff[2003/23]
English:Adhesive polymer composition[2003/23]
French:Composition de polymère adhésive[2003/23]
Examination procedure29.11.2001Examination requested  [2003/23]
04.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2010Fee for grant paid
29.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.02.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17]
Request for further processing for:04.03.2005Request for further processing filed
04.03.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.03.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
16.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
17.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
24.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
TR19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
PT20.09.2010
IE29.11.2010
LU29.11.2010
CH30.11.2010
LI30.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
PT20.09.2010
IE29.11.2010
LU29.11.2010
CH30.11.2010
LI30.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
Former [2011/47]AT19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
PT20.09.2010
IE29.11.2010
CH30.11.2010
LI30.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
Former [2011/38]AT19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
PT20.09.2010
CH30.11.2010
LI30.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
Former [2011/31]AT19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
PT20.09.2010
MC30.11.2010
Former [2011/08]AT19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
PT20.09.2010
Former [2011/07]AT19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
DK19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
Former [2011/05]AT19.05.2010
CY19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
Former [2011/01]AT19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
GR20.08.2010
Former [2010/49]AT19.05.2010
SE19.05.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH08208915  ;
 [X]EP0896044  (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) [X] 1-15 * example 3 *;
 [X]EP0791628  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND) [X] 1-15 * examples B4,C1,C3 *;
 [A]WO0155275  (DU PONT) [A] 1-15 * examples 2,4,7,8,13,20,23 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1996-422109, XP002196242 & JPH08208915 A 19960813 (UBE) [X] 1-15 * abstract *