Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1217172

EP1217172 - Method for the reduction of the variance of the cooling medium consumption in components of a turbomachine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.03.2006
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.03.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.04.2006  [2006/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALSTOM Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
[N/P]
Former [2004/03]For all designated states
ALSTOM Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5401 Baden / CH
Former [2002/26]For all designated states
ALSTOM Power N.V.
Hullenbergweg 393-395
1101 CS Amsterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Beeck, Alexander, Dr.
516 Spring Island Way
Orlando, Florida 32828 / US
02 / Nagler, Christoph
Minervastr. 116
8032 Zürich / CH
03 / Richter, Mark
Delfterstrasse 25
5004 Aarau / CH
 [2005/30]
Former [2002/26]01 / Beeck, Alexander, Dr.
516 Spring Island Way
Orlando, Florida 32828 / US
02 / Nagler, Christoph
Minervastr. 116
8032 Zürich / CH
03 / Richter, Markoph
Delfterstrasse 25
5004 Aarau / CH
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/47]
Former [2002/26]Liebe, Rainer , et al
ALSTOM (Switzerland)Ltd CHSP Intellectual Property Haselstrasse 16/699/5.OG
5401 Baden / CH
Application number, filing date01128802.404.12.2001
[2002/26]
Priority number, dateDE200016426622.12.2000         Original published format: DE 10064266
[2002/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1217172
Date:26.06.2002
Language:DE
[2002/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1217172
Date:18.06.2003
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1217172
Date:04.05.2005
Language:DE
[2005/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:F01D5/18, B23P9/00
[2002/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2004/11]
Former [2002/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verringerung der Varianz im Kühlmediumverbrauch von Komponenten einer Strömungsmaschine[2002/26]
English:Method for the reduction of the variance of the cooling medium consumption in components of a turbomachine[2002/26]
French:Procédé pour réduire la variance de la consommation d' agent réfrigerant aux composants d' une turbomachine[2002/26]
Examination procedure05.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/06]
11.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2005Fee for grant paid
12.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US3696504  (CUPLER JOHN A) [A] 1,9,10 * figure -; claim - * * column 1, line 30 - line 33 * * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 6 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 30 *;
 [A]US5247766  (KILDEA ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1,9,10 * column 1, line 11 - line 42 * * column 2, line 35 - line 43; figure . *;
 [A]US5501892  (OHTSUBO SHINJI [JP]) [A] 1,9,10 * column 4, line 9 - column 6, line 37; figure - *