Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1321104

EP1321104 - Ablation tool and process for cutting, fragmenting and/or removing material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GFD-Gesellschaft für Diamantprodukte mbH
Wilhelm-Runge-Strasse 11
89081 Ulm / DE
[2003/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Gluche, Peter, Dr.
Schwörhausgasse 4
89073 Ulm / DE
02 / Ertl, Stephan
Ochsensteige 72/4
89075 Ulm / DE
03 / Lingenfelder, Christian
Holzgasse 9
89075 Ulm-Mähringen / DE
04 / Kohn, Erhard, Prof. Dr.
Ratgebweg 21
89081 Ulm/Lehr / DE
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner
Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date01129004.606.12.2001
[2003/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1321104
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/08, A61F9/007
[2003/26]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/12]
Former [2003/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Ablationsinstrument und Verfahren zum Schneiden, Fragmentieren und/oder Abtragen von Material[2003/26]
English:Ablation tool and process for cutting, fragmenting and/or removing material[2003/26]
French:Outil d'ablation et procédé pour couper, fragmenter et/ou enlèver de la matériau[2003/26]
Examination procedure30.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/40]
03.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.02.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
10.02.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
10.02.2004M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9918606  (MERCKLE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,9-16,19 * page 1 - page 5, line 30 * * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 12 * * page 8, line 10 - line 20 * * page 8, line 32 - page 9, line 5 * * figures 1C,2,3; claims 1-12,14-19 *;
 [A]US5417654  (KELMAN CHARLES D [US]) [A] 1-41 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US5776127  (ANDERSON RICHARD ROX [US], et al) [A] 1-41 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US5190541  (ABELE JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-41 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9916371  (BOSTON SCIENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-41 * figure -; claim - *