Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320255

EP1320255 - Digital releasing device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.12.2010
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.01.2011  [2011/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beta Research GmbH
Betastrasse 1
85774 Unterföhring / DE
[2003/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Boje, Markus
Lucile-Grahn-Strasse 23
81675 München / DE
02 / Proske, Wolfram
Am Sandberg 10
84424 Isen / DE
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Heselberger, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Heselberger, Johannes
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2003/25]Heselberger, Johannes
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date01129324.814.12.2001
[2003/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1320255
Date:18.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/00, H04N7/16
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/25]
TitleGerman:Digitale Freigabevorrichtung[2003/25]
English:Digital releasing device[2003/25]
French:Dispositif de démarrage[2003/25]
Examination procedure18.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
15.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/02]
27.08.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
15.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9637996  (BRITISH SKY BROADCASTING LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11,13 * page 10, line 22 - page 16, line 20 * * page 23, line 5 - page 30, line 1 * * page 37, line 20 - page 39, line 15 * * page 45, line 6 - page 46, line 6 * * figures 2,3,7-10 *;
 [A]WO9944361  (GEMSTAR DEV CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 10 * * page 11, line 10 - page 12, line 27 * * page 30, line 23 - page 34, line 14 *