Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320215

EP1320215 - Method and device for broadcast in point-to-point networks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/18]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ)
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Hundscheidt, Frank
Spiesstraat 63
6463 BK Kerkrade / NL
02 / Lohmar, Thorsten
Hirschgraben 9-11
52062 Aachen / DE
03 / Keller, Ralf
Talblick 22
52146 Wuerselen / DE
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Tonscheidt, Andreas
Ericsson GmbH
Ericsson Allee 1
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Tonscheidt, Andreas
Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
Former [2003/25]Tonscheidt, Andreas
Ericsson Eurolab Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Ericsson Allee 1
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
Application number, filing date01129718.113.12.2001
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1320215
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/18, H04Q7/22
[2003/25]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/11]
Former [2003/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Rundsendung in einem Punkt-zu-Punkt-Netzwerk[2003/25]
English:Method and device for broadcast in point-to-point networks[2003/25]
French:Procédé et dispositif de diffusion dans un réseau point à point[2003/25]
Examination procedure19.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/38]
15.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/38]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.01.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
28.01.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
28.01.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1071296  (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-19 * column 5, line 48 - column 9, line 19 *;
 [A]WO9959355  (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 7, line 18 - page 8, line 4 * * page 11, line 11 - page 13, line 8 *