Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319569

EP1319569 - Coupling device, especially for a railway vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.06.2006
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 16.05.2007  [2007/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Turbo Scharfenberg GmbH & Co. KG
Gottfried-Linke-Strasse 205
38239 Salzgitter-Watenstedt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
Voith Turbo Scharfenberg GmbH & Co. KG
Gottfried-Linke Strasse 205
38239 Salzgitter-Watenstedt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Heller, Wilhelm
Hangweg 11
8561 Söding / AT
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Rupprecht, Kay , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Rupprecht, Kay, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date01129984.917.12.2001
[2003/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1319569
Date:18.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1319569
Date:24.08.2005
Language:DE
[2005/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:B61G5/04, B61G1/06
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/25]
TitleGerman:Kupplungsanordnung, insbesondere für ein Schienenfahrzeug[2003/25]
English:Coupling device, especially for a railway vehicle[2003/25]
French:Dispositif d' accouplement, notamment pour un véhicule ferroviaire[2003/25]
Examination procedure17.12.2001Examination requested  [2003/25]
03.09.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2005Fee for grant paid
24.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI24.08.2005
GB24.08.2005
IE24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
CY17.12.2005
CH31.12.2005
LI31.12.2005
LU31.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
PT24.01.2006
[2007/20]
Former [2007/09]FI24.08.2005
GB24.08.2005
IE24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
CH31.12.2005
LI31.12.2005
LU31.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
PT24.01.2006
Former [2007/03]FI24.08.2005
GB24.08.2005
IE24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
CH31.12.2005
LI31.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
PT24.01.2006
Former [2006/40]FI24.08.2005
GB24.08.2005
IE24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
PT24.01.2006
Former [2006/35]FI24.08.2005
GB24.08.2005
IE24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
PT24.01.2006
Former [2006/26]FI24.08.2005
IE24.08.2005
DK24.11.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
PT24.01.2006
Former [2006/25]FI24.08.2005
IE24.08.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
PT24.01.2006
Former [2006/14]FI24.08.2005
GR24.11.2005
SE24.11.2005
ES05.12.2005
Former [2006/13]FI24.08.2005
SE24.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE68655  (JOSEPH TAYLOR, GLASGOW) [X] 1,3,4,10,11 * the whole document * [Y] 2,5,7-9;
 [XA]DE192076  (NICOLA PAVIA UND GIACOMO CASALIS, TURIN) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2;
 [Y]CH85019  (FRITZ KRAEUCHI [CH]) [Y] 2 * page 1; figure 2 *;
 [Y]CH425877  (WSESOJUZNYI NII SHELEZNODOROSH [RU]) [Y] 5,7-9 * figures 10-12 *;
 [A]GB2353261  (WILLIAM COOK CAST PRODUCTS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-4,10 * the whole document *